Singh v. Gillis
Plaintiff: Lakhwinder Singh
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr, Warden Shawn R. Gillis and John Doe
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00063
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Patrick McCallion, Supervisory Deportation Officer, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement)(Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the United States served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (PG)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk as to Office of the U.S. Attorney served on 4/2/2020 answer due 4/22/2020 (PG)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden Shawn R. Gillis served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/22/2020. (PG)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. The Clerk shall correct the short title of this case to Singh vs Gillis. John Doe (Secretary of DHS), W. B. Barr and John Doe (U.S. Ice Field Office Director) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 3/31/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643058743.), filed by Lakhwinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice to Alien of File Custody Review, #2 Notice of Assignment, #3 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakhwinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?