Singh v. Gillis
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf, William P. Barr, Shawn Gillis, Ken Cuccinelli and Stanley Crockett
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00064
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Respondent is Shawn R. Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center and the additional Respondents listed on the docket are hereby removed as Respondents. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file (1) an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause and also (2) a response to Petitioners Emergency Motion #2 to Stop Removal within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 05/04/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before April 15, 2020, Petitioner must submit for filing the signed "Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury" attached to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/17/2020. [Copy of Order, a copy of pages 1-29 of the Petition #1 and the Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury form mailed to Petitioner] (CS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2020: #1 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury form) (CS).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 (EMERGENCY) MOTION to Stay Removal by Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Envelope, #10 Envelope from Natchez Office)(KNS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058760.), filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope from Natchez Office)(KNS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2020: #3 Notice of Assignment); #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KNS). Modified on 3/12/2020 (KNS). (copies of NEFs, Receipt and Notice of Assignment mailed to Petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?