Nur v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Fazel Haadi Nur
Respondent: William Barr, Philip T. Miller, Chad Wolf and Shawn Gillis
Case Number: 5:2020cv00067
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Fazel Haadi Nur (receive via Fax from Adams County Detention Center). (Attachments: #1 Medicals, #2 Fax Cover Sheet) (VM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Shane Musgrave, #2 Exhibit B-Travel Document)(Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Attorney General of the United States as to Shawn Gillis served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (VM)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Shawn Gillis as to Shawn Gillis served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/8/2020, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Civil Process Clerk as to Shawn Gillis served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (VM)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, William Barr, Chad Wolf, and Philip T. Miller are hereby removed as Respondents in this case. Respondent Warden Shaw Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/17/2020. (CS)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus AND RELEASE FROM DETENTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241 ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643058779.), filed by Fazel Haadi Nur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nur v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philip T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fazel Haadi Nur
Represented By: James Paul Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?