Kumar v. Gillis
Plaintiff: Amit Kumar
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr, Secretary of DHS, U.S. ICE Field Office Director and Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00069
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number 34643058814.), filed by Amit Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM) filed by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Deportation Officer Patrick McCallion, #2 Exhibit B - Warning for Failure to Depart and Instruction Sheet)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn R. Gillis answer due 5/13/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 20, 2020 (KPM)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Executed by Attorney General of the United States as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (VM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Civil Process Clerk as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (VM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (VM)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis, Warden Adams County Correctional Center. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. U.S. ICE Field Office Director, W. B. Barr and Secretary of DHS terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/1/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number 34643058814.), filed by Amit Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General W. B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ICE Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?