Reyes v. Gillis
Petitioner: Gary Jesus Salazar Reyes
Respondent: Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00070
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #7 Report and Recommendations. Mail sent to Gary Jesus Salazar Reyes. (LAT)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gary Jesus Salazar Reyes. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 5, 2020. (MMc)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shawn R. Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-ICE Declaration)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Attorney General) served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (LAT)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Civil Process Clerk) served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (LAT)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis(Warden) served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (LAT)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Respondent Warden Shawn R. Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/27/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058815.), filed by Gary Jesus Salazar Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Various Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Jesus Salazar Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?