Carlos v. Barr
Defendant: Shawn R. Gillis
Petitioner: Antonio Dos Santos Carlos
Respondent: William Barr
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00072
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the U.S. served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (ND)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (ND)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (ND)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Shawn R. Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center, replaces William Barr as the Respondent. Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 05/01/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corrected PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus in Response to #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by Antonio Dos Santos Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before May 13, 2020, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 04/22/2020. [Copy of Order and Petition #1 mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus in Response to #2 ORDER, filed by Antonio Dos Santos Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Petitioner shall name his custodian (which is the Warden at his current place of detention) as the Respondent and Petitioner shall sign his Petition #1 under penalty of perjury and file it with the Clerk of Court on or before April 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/20/2020. [Copy of Order and a copy of the Petition #1 mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 paid; receipt number 34643058823 ), filed by Antonio Dos Santos Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting docs., #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Dos Santos Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?