Gurvinder v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Gurvinder Gurvinder
Respondent: W.B. Barr, Shawn Gillis, Secretary of DHS and U.S. Ice Field Office
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00122
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction based on mootness filed by Shawn Gillis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gurvinder Gurvinder. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 24, 2020. (MMc)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction based on mootness filed by Shawn Gillis (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction based on mootness by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-ICE Declaration)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of U.S. served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (ND)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden, Adams Co. Corr. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (ND)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis by Civil Process Clerk, Office of the U. S. Attorney served on 05/18/2020, answer due 06/08/2020. (KNS)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Shawn Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center, is the proper Respondent and any others listed on the docket are hereby removed as Respondents. Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 05/13/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 paid; receipt number 34643059242 ), filed by Gurvinder Gurvinder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurvinder v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Ice Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurvinder Gurvinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?