Singh v. Gillis
Petitioner: Majer Singh
Respondent: W. B. Barr, Shawn R. Gillis, Secretary of DHS and U.S. Ice Field Office
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00124
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Benavidez Declaration)(Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to 06/03/20 TEXT ONLY Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Mail sent to Petitioner. (KNS)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn R. Gillis answer due 6/18/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 3, 2020. (MMc)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shawn R. Gillis (Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Attorney General of the U. S. DOJ as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (KNS)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (KNS)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Civil Process Clerk, Office of U. S. Attorney as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (KNS)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Respondent is Shawn R. Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center and the additional Respondents listed on the docket are hereby removed as a Respondent. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 05/11/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643059244.), filed by Majer Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEF, Receipt, Notice of Assignment and a copy of stamped "Filed" petition mailed to Petitioner in self-addressed, stamped envelope provided)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Majer Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Emily S. Nobile-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Ice Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?