Legrone v. Julian et al
Plaintiff: Geneva Legrone
Defendant: Annyce Ingram, Dave Burkebile, Arturo Williams, Shawn Gillis, Iesha Norman, Stephen Julian and Jeremy Byrant
Case Number: 5:2020cv00130
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams (Morris, Lindley Anna)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response due by 7/2/2020. Reply due by 7/9/2020. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on June 18, 2020. (lda)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams (Morris, Lindley Anna)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 5, 2020 (KPM)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Geneva Legrone (Norris, Robert)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT re #8 Summons Returned Executed by Geneva Legrone (Watson, Louis)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 State Court SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geneva Legrone. Jeremy Byrant served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Watson, Louis) Modified on 6/4/2020 to reflect State Court Summons (ND).
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Threadgill on behalf of All Defendants (Threadgill, Timothy)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams.(Morris, Lindley Anna)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 State Court Record by Defendants Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams Volumes 1 (Morris, Lindley Anna)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to file state court record. Defendants shall file the state court record on or before 6/3/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 21, 2020. (MMc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend State Court Record Filing Deadline by Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams (Morris, Lindley Anna)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dave Burkebile, Shawn Gillis, Annyce Ingram, Stephen Julian, Iesha Norman, Arturo Williams.(Morris, Lindley Anna)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Geneva Legrone (Norris, Robert)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Iesha Norman from Adams County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-KV-0064-S. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4269035) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Iesha Norman Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Charge, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/7/2020) (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legrone v. Julian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annyce Ingram
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Burkebile
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Williams
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iesha Norman
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Julian
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Byrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Legrone
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?