Darville et al v. Germany et al
Plaintiff: Mark Mills, Joe Ann Crawford Darville, Robert H. Darville, Bobbie Jean Crawford Sterling and Shirley B. Crawford
Defendant: Denbury Resources, Inc., N. Forrest Germany, Rosewood Partners, LLC, E.B. Germany & Sons, Inc., E.B. Germany & Sons, LLC and Denbury Onshore, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00180
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2020 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 12/3/20. (KPM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by N. Forrest Germany (West, William)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shirley B. Crawford, Joe Ann Crawford Darville, Robert H. Darville, Mark Mills, Bobbie Jean Crawford Sterling (Dowdy, Wayne)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shirley B. Crawford, Joe Ann Crawford Darville, Robert H. Darville, Mark Mills, Bobbie Jean Crawford Sterling (Dowdy, Wayne)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss filed by E.B. Germany & Sons, LLC, E.B. Germany & Sons, Inc., N. Forrest Germany. Response due 10/27/20, reply due 11/3/20. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/14/20. (cb)
October 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : Court staff was notified by Judge's chambers that this document was incorrect filed as an ex parte motion. Court staff modified document security, so opposing party can view motion. (LAT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by E.B. Germany & Sons, Inc., E.B. Germany & Sons, LLC, N. Forrest Germany.(West, William)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by E.B. Germany & Sons, Inc., E.B. Germany & Sons, LLC, N. Forrest Germany (West, William) Modified on 10/14/2020 (LAT).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . The Court grants the motion in part and denies it in part. The response to the motion to dismiss is due on or before 10/19/2020. The reply is due on or before 10/26/2020. The motion is moot insofar as Plaintiffs asked the Court to compel Defendant to file a corporate disclosure pursuant to Rule 7.1. No further order will issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/5/20. (cb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
October 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc. #9 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Corporate Disclosure Statement instead of Notice (other). Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (VM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William) Modified on 10/5/2020 (VM).
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Shirley B. Crawford, Joe Ann Crawford Darville, Robert H. Darville, Mark Mills, Bobbie Jean Crawford Sterling (Dowdy, Wayne)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Order Approving Chapter 11 Plan by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Denbury Resources, Inc. Response filed 10/2/20; reply due 10/9/20. Signed by Judge Keith Starrett on September 21, 2020. (cb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/21/2020) (LAT).
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Denbury Onshore' LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (2nd Amended) and Affirmative Defenses by Denbury Onshore, LLC.(Blair, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Denbury Resources, Inc. filed by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Blair on behalf of Denbury Onshore, LLC, Denbury Resources, Inc. (Blair, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Denbury Onshore, LLC, Denbury Resources, Inc. from Pike County Circuit Court, MS, case number 57CI1:20-cv-59-S. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4371721) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Affidavit and Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit - Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit - Filed Documents, #5 Exhibit - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darville et al v. Germany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denbury Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Eric L. Patterson
Represented By: William F. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Forrest Germany
Represented By: William E. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosewood Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.B. Germany & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: William E. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.B. Germany & Sons, LLC
Represented By: William E. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denbury Onshore, LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Patterson
Represented By: William F. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mills
Represented By: Wayne Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ann Crawford Darville
Represented By: Wayne Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Darville
Represented By: Wayne Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Jean Crawford Sterling
Represented By: Wayne Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley B. Crawford
Represented By: Wayne Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?