Perkins v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: William B. Perkins
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. doing business as State Auto and Meridian Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00187
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER granting Joint Ore Tenus Motion to Substitute Party. Meridian Security Insurance Company added. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 18, 2020 (KPM)
November 18, 2020 Joint Ore Tenus MOTION to Substitute Party. (KPM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Jury Trial set for a three week term beginning 9/20/2021 before District Judge David C. Bramlette III; ETT: 2-3 days; Pretrial Conference set for 9/1-3/2021 before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker; Discovery due by 5/3/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/1/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/1/2021; Motions due by 5/17/2021; ADR to be completed by discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 5, 2020 (KPM)
November 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2020. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Mack Reeves for plaintiff; Jason Strong for defendant. (KPM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mack A. Reeves on behalf of William B. Perkins (Reeves, Mack)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by William B. Perkins (Saltaformaggio, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. (Strong, Jason)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. (Strong, Jason)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. (Strong, Jason)
October 1, 2020 Rule 16(a) order mailed to Abbey Reeves (KPM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbey Reeves on behalf of State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. (Reeves, Abbey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/30/20. (KPM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. (Strong, Jason)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (with Defenses) by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co..(Strong, Jason)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. from Circuit Court of Wilkinson County, Mississippi, case number 20-109. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4381243) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Report of Procedures, #3 Exhibit C - Post-Surgical Physical Therapy Records, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Expenses, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Perkins
Represented By: Michael Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Mack A. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co. doing business as State Auto
Represented By: Jason H. Strong
Represented By: Abbey Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason H. Strong
Represented By: Abbey Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?