Uni-Form Components Co. v. Great River Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Uni-Form Components Co.
Defendant: Great River Industries, LLC and Enerfab, Inc.
Interested Party: Enerfab Process Solution & Fabricated Products, Inc., Enerfab Services, LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Enerfab Power & Industrial, Inc., HBH Holdings, Inc., WDJ Industrial Group, LLC, Marmon Holdings, Inc., Tron Mechanical, Incorporated, Enerpipe, Inc. and Brighton TruEdge Heads & Fabricated Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00188
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Uni-Form Components Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit Sales Order Acknowledgement, #3 Exhibit Sales Order Acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit Sales Order Acknowledgement)(McDowell, Martin)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss or to transfer as moot. As the alternative relief has been granted via prior order, the motion is moot. If jurisdictional issues remain to be decided after the amended complaint is filed, they may be addressed via appropriate motion. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 13, 2020 (Parker, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation and for good cause shown, plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint and shall do so on or before November 16, 2020. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings to the amended complaint on or before December 7, 2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 5, 2020 (Parker, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Uni-Form Components Co. (McDowell, Martin)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Raymond A Neuer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 3, 2020. (AS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Raymond A. Neuer), by Uni-Form Components Co. (PG)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Hunter Mac Barrow and Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 29, 2020 (KPM)
October 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Hunter Mac Barrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER rescinding text orders of 10/28/20 admitting Hunter Mac Barrow and Elizabeth Scroggs pro hac vice. The motions or applications #25 #26 indicate that the moving attorneys seek to represent HBH Holdings, Inc., however, they were docketed on behalf of Enerfab, Inc. and Great River Industries, LLC making it unclear which client or party movants seek to represent. The moving attorneys may refile the motions or applications with the correct client listed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 28, 2020 (KPM)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order (RESCINDING BY TEXT ORDER of 10-28-2020) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Hunter Mac Barrow is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 28, 2020 (KPM) Modified on 10/28/2020 (PG).
October 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc. #24 Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #26 . (PG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Hunter Mac Barrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order (RESCINDING BY TEXT ORDER of 10-28-2020) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 28, 2020 (KPM) Modified on 10/28/2020 (PG).
October 28, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404857) by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. MOTION for Hunter Mac Barrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404843) by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Carson, Dorsey) Modified on 10/28/2020 (PG).
October 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Patrick McDowell on behalf of Uni-Form Components Co. (McDowell, Martin)
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Wade, Jr on behalf of Uni-Form Components Co. (Wade, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire W. Ketner on behalf of Uni-Form Components Co. (Ketner, Claire)
October 23, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #18 : Error disregard this entry. See corrected entry #20 . (cwl)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Foster Hatten on behalf of Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Hatten, Eric)
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay K. Roberts on behalf of Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Roberts, Lindsay)
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorsey R. Carson, Jr on behalf of Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Carson, Dorsey)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorsey R. Carson, Jr on behalf of Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC (Carson, Dorsey)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 Letter sent to Hunter Mac Barrow, Esq. and Raymond A. Neuer, Esq., on September 29, 2020, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01594. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Southern District of Mississippi, Western Division; (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Uni-Form Components Co., filed.(Neuer, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by Great River Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by Enerfab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Uni-Form Components Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Neuer, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, Western Division filed by Uni-Form Components Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Neuer, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC, filed.(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Enerfab, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, Western Division by Great River Industries, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Uni-Form Components Co., filed.(Neuer, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uni-Form Components Co., filed.(Neuer, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st Judicial District, case number 2020-20582 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24631528) filed by Enerfab, Inc., Great River Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Barrow, Hunter) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uni-Form Components Co. v. Great River Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enerfab Process Solution & Fabricated Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enerfab Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Berkshire Hathaway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enerfab Power & Industrial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HBH Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WDJ Industrial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marmon Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tron Mechanical, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Enerpipe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Brighton TruEdge Heads & Fabricated Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uni-Form Components Co.
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Represented By: Martin Patrick McDowell
Represented By: John E. Wade, Jr.
Represented By: Claire W. Ketner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great River Industries, LLC
Represented By: Hunter Mac Barrow
Represented By: Lindsay K. Roberts
Represented By: Eric Foster Hatten
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Mac Barrow - PHV
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enerfab, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Mac Barrow
Represented By: Lindsay K. Roberts
Represented By: Eric Foster Hatten
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Mac Barrow - PHV
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Scroggs - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?