Perez-Lopez v. GEO Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Perez-Lopez
Defendant: A.C.C.C. Washington MS., GEO Group Inc. and Great Plains CI
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2021cv00021
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Oscar Perez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT mailed to Plaintiff. (ND)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00017. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring case to District of Southern Mississippi. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and Notice of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #6 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2021. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-82415. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Greenville Division. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/9/2021.] [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/9/2021.] [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/9/2021.] [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to Bivens against A.C.C.C. Washington MS., GEO Group Inc., Great Plains CI. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Oscar Perez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/9/2021.] [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 2/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Lopez v. GEO Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C.C.C. Washington MS.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains CI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Perez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?