Gonzalez v. Gillis et al
Plaintiff: Louis Gonzalez and Carlos Ramos Sanchez
Defendant: Custody Officer Unknown Devaull, Warden Shawn R. Gillis and Custody Officer Cedrick Jones
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2021cv00030
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 Change of Address filed by Louis Gonzalez. Address updated on docket: Etowah County Detention Center, 827 Forrest Avenue, Gadsden, AL 35901. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in this cause without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 04/06/2021. (CS)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT: re #1 Complaint by Louis Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(VM) Modified on 4/5/2021 (VM).
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Louis Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Devaull, Shawn R. Gillis, Cedrick Jones, filed by Louis Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Gillis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ramos Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custody Officer Unknown Devaull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custody Officer Cedrick Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?