Grayson v. City of Natchez et al
Plaintiff: Londell Grayson
Defendant: City of Natchez, City of Natchez Police Department and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2021cv00085
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: David C Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Natchez answer due 12/20/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/8/2021. (dcw)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by City of Natchez (Clark, Howard)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Natchez (Butler, Gregory)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Londell Grayson. City of Natchez served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Stevenson, Damon)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Natchez and City of Natchez Police Department. (ND)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Natchez, City of Natchez Police Department, John Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4669516), filed by Londell Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. City of Natchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Londell Grayson
Represented By: Damon R. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Natchez
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Natchez Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?