Estate of Henry Missick v. CoreCivic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Estate of Henry Missick
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00021
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Bradley W Rath
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Estate of Henry Missick (McDuff, Robert)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for a two week trial calendar beginning on May 6, 2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (Natchez) before District Judge Keith Starrett. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (Natchez) before District Judge Keith Starrett. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2023. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2023. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 9/1/2023. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 10/2/2023. Motions due by 12/15/2023. Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 1:30 PM in Natchez before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2024. EDT: 3-5 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 5/2/2023. (ALS) Modified on 5/3/2023 to correct typo (AB).
May 1, 2023 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2023. PARTICIPANTS: Robert B. McDuff (Plaintiff); Lindley Anna Little Morris (Defendant). A Case Management Order will be entered. (TS)
April 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by CoreCivic, Inc. (Morris, Lindley Anna)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 State Court Record by Defendant CoreCivic, Inc. Volumes 1 of 1 (Morris, Lindley Anna)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. (AB)
March 22, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CoreCivic, Inc. (Morris, Lindley Anna)
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreCivic, Inc. (Morris, Lindley Anna)
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CoreCivic, Inc. from Adams County Circuit Court, MS, case number 23-KV-0014-D. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5075235) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Service Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Henry Missick v. CoreCivic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Henry Missick
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Lindley Anna Little Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?