Daye v. United Auto Credit Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kaelin Daye
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation, John Doe Defendant and Vroom, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00100
Filed: September 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Filing 18 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Vroom, Inc. by Vroom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition)(Leeth, Alan)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on November 7, 2024. (jm)
November 7, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Kaelin Daye (McDaniel, Chris)
November 7, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #15 . Memorandum brief filed as a part of or an exhibit to another pleading: Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (ND)
November 7, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #14 . Incorrect linkage made filing this REPLY. The REPLY should be linked to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. All related filings to motions from the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order", should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (ND)
November 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kaelin Daye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo is Support)(McDaniel, Chris)
November 6, 2024 Filing 14 REPLY to #10 Response in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kaelin Daye (McDaniel, Chris) Modified on 11/7/2024 to correct linkage (ND).
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply . Reply due by 11/10/2024. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on November 4, 2024. (lda)
October 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kaelin Daye (McDaniel, Chris)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and Cancelling Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/25/2024 (NL)
October 25, 2024 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Terminated Case Management Conference set for November 20, 2024. (NL)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney, Matthew T. Mitchell, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants, United Auto Credit Corporation and Vroom, Inc., in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/25/24 (NL)
October 24, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by United Auto Credit Corporation, Vroom, Inc. (Leeth, Alan)
October 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Matthew T. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5520974) by United Auto Credit Corporation, Vroom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Leeth, Alan)
October 10, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kaelin Daye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Retail Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - TXRIC, #4 Exhibit D - Texas Lawsuit Against Vroom, #5 Exhibit E - Complaint)(McDaniel, Chris)
October 10, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kaelin Daye (McDaniel, Chris)
October 10, 2024 Filing 6 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kaelin Daye (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Retail Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - TXRIC, #4 Exhibit D - Texas Lawsuit Against Vroom, #5 Exhibit E - Complaint)(McDaniel, Chris) Modified on 10/10/2024 (LAT).
October 10, 2024 Filing 5 ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.***MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kaelin Daye (McDaniel, Chris) Modified on 10/10/2024 (LAT).
October 10, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 ,#6 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It will be correctly refiled. (LAT)
October 3, 2024 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United Auto Credit Corporation, Vroom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jamie Buehler, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Drew Robinson)(Leeth, Alan)
October 3, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by United Auto Credit Corporation, Vroom, Inc. (Leeth, Alan)
October 2, 2024 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
September 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Auto Credit Corporation, Vroom, Inc. from Circuit Court of Adams County, Mississippi, case number 01CI1:24-cv-00009. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5507757) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daye v. United Auto Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vroom, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaelin Daye
Represented By: Chris B. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?