State of Missouri v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al. Featured Case

Plaintiff State of Missouri is seeking to block the Army Corps of Engineers from destroying portions of the Front Line levee, which will allegedly flood most of Mississippi County and a portion of New Madrid County.

Plaintiff: State of Missouri, Missouri Department of Natural Resources and Missouri State Emergency Management Agency
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Michael Walsh and Vernie L. Reichling , Jr.
Intervenor_defendant: State of Illinois and Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 1:2011cv00067
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2011 Filing 28 Initial Notification from USCA for 27 Notice of Appeal filed by Missouri Department of Natural Resources, State of Missouri, Missouri State Emergency Management Agency USCA Appeal Number: 11-1937. This appeal is being forwarded to the court. You will be immediately notified of any development in the case.(BAK)
April 29, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiffs Missouri Department of Natural Resources, Missouri State Emergency Management Agency, State of Missouri. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0865-2733878.
April 29, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff State of Missouri motion is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/29/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(CSG)
April 28, 2011 Filing 25 Exhibit List from TRO Motion hearing held 4/28/11. (CSG)
April 28, 2011 Filing 24 Witness List from TRO Motion hearing held 4/28/11. (CSG)
April 28, 2011 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2011 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Missouri. (Court Reporter:Lynne Shrum.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CSG) Modified on 4/29/2011 (CSG).
April 28, 2011 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Riley, Sean)
April 28, 2011 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Riley, Sean) Modified on 4/28/2011 (JMC). (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - see corrected document #22) Modified on 4/28/2011 (JMC).
April 28, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Riley, Sean)
April 28, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Riley, Sean)
April 28, 2011 Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Edward Davis (Filing fee wvd) by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (MRS) Modified on 4/28/2011 (MRS). filed by State of Illinois ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/28/2011. (JMC)
April 28, 2011 Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 14 MOTION for Relief to Waive Fees by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex) filed by State of Illinois ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/28/2011. (JMC)
April 28, 2011 Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 10 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex) filed by State of Illinois ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/28/2011. (JMC)
April 28, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Edward Davis (Filing fee wvd) by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (MRS) Modified on 4/28/2011 (MRS).
April 28, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Relief to Waive Fees by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex)
April 28, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex)
April 28, 2011 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 10 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed filed by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Juhl, # 2 Affidavit of Wilson)(Gradeless, Rex)
April 28, 2011 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex)
April 28, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed by Intervenor Defendant State of Illinois. (Gradeless, Rex)
April 28, 2011 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff State of Missouri. (McManus, John)
April 27, 2011 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants United States Army Corps of Engineers, Michael Walsh, Vernie L. Reiching, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 a, # 4 Exhibit 3 b, # 5 Exhibit 3 c, # 6 Exhibit 3 d, # 7 Exhibit 3 e, # 8 Exhibit 3 f, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5)(Llewellyn, Nicholas) Modified on 4/28/2011 (JMC).
April 27, 2011 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion Proposed Order by Plaintiff State of Missouri. (McManus, John) Modified on 4/28/2011 (JMC).
April 27, 2011 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L Blome for Plaintiff State of Missouri. (Blome, Jessica)
April 27, 2011 Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Motion hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, April 28, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. is now rescheduled for Thursday, April 28, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. by agreement of all parties. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/27/11. (CSG)
April 26, 2011 Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Conference call held with Court and counsel for plaintiff and defendants participating. By agreement of counsel, case set for hearing on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order 10:00 a.m., Thursday, April 28, 2011, in Cape Girardeau. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/26/11. (CSG) Modified on 4/27/2011 (CSG).
April 26, 2011 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff State of Missouri. (McManus, John)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Missouri. (McManus, John)
April 26, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-2729141, in the amount of $350 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by State of Missouri. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Birds Point New Madrid Floodway Operations Plan, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Paul D. Parmenter, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Davis Minton)(McManus, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2011: # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Original Filing Form) (CSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Represented By: John K. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Represented By: John K. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri State Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Represented By: John K. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Represented By: Edward Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Walsh
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Represented By: Edward Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernie L. Reichling , Jr.
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Represented By: Edward Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: State of Illinois
Represented By: Thomas Edward Davis
Represented By: Rex L. Gradeless, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Sean J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?