Roberts v. Lombardi et al
Plaintiff: Kyle A. Roberts
Defendant: George A. Lombardi, Dwayne V. Kempker, Corizon, Inc. and Rick Jones
Case Number: 1:2012cv00134
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: DeKalb
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 164 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregg W. Hosch, DDS and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Kyle A. Roberts; motion is GRANTED in part. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/2/15. (CSG)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 167 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Written Report and Opinions of Dr. Andrew Martine filed by Defendant Gregory Pernoud, 165 MOTION to Exclude Opinion and Report of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Exper t Witness Dr. Andrew Martine filed by Defendant Corizon, LLC, Defendant Ricky D. Jones, Defendant Ernest Jackson, Defendant Ernest W. Jackson, DMD, Institutional Dental Services, P.C., Defendant Stephanie Novak; motions are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/15. (CSG)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 195 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit and Testimony of Dr. V. Jose Thomas filed by Defendant Gregory Pernoud; motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are granted leave to take the deposition of Dr. Thomas. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/19/15. (CSG)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM: The Court will dismiss the following claims: Counts III and IV as to defendants Corizon, JIDS, Dr. Jackson, Dr. Jones, Nurse Novak, and Dr. Pernoud; all counts against defendant Graham; all counts as to defendant Lombardi. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/27/14. (CSG)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as to plaintiff's claims for prospective injunctive relief against defendant George Lombardi in his official capacity only, the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the se cond amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendant George Lombardi shall reply to plaintiff's claims for prospective injunctive relief within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/24/13. (CSG)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue on the second amended complaint and supplements, because the allegations are legally frivolous and fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B).A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/12. (CSG)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kyle A. Roberts, 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kyle A. Roberts, 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kyle A. Roberts.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel [Docs. #4, #6, and #17] and motion for time to find a lawyer [Doc. #20] areDENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/23/12. (CSG)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before October 9, 2012, that complies with this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in addition to a copy of this Order, the Clerk sha ll forward to plaintiff the court-provided form for a prisoner to file a "Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983."IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to amend his complaintin accordance with this Court's instructions will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Response to Court due by 10/9/2012.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/10/12. (MRS)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Kyle A. Roberts motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed informa pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.70 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States Dist rict Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filin g fee within thirty (30) days, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before September 17, 2012, that complies with this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in addition to a copy of this Order, the Clerk shall mail plaintiff a copy of the Court's form for prisoners to file a "Complaint Under the Civil Rights Ac t, 42 U.S.C. § 1983." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. If the case is dismissed for non-compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 9/17/2012.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/17/12. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Lombardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne V. Kempker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?