Anderson v. Lambordia et al
Plaintiff: |
Andre Anderson |
Defendant: |
Kevin Spitzer, Jarome Kizer, Ian Wallace, Cheryl Thompson and George Lambordia |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00021 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 4, 2014 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file with the Court a notice of his intention to pursue his claims in this case no later than April 21, 2014. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, his case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Response to Court due by 4/21/2014. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/4/14. (MRS)
|
March 11, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.98 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shal l issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Kizer and Spitzer pursuant to theCourt's waiver agreement with the Missouri Attorney General's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 19 97e(g)(2), defendants Kizer and Spitzer shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant George Lambordia, Ian Wallaceor Cheryl Thompson because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both.IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to plaintiff's due process claims because these claims are legally frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #4] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/10/2013.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/11/2013. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?