Bilskey et al v. Bluff City Ice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy R. Bilskey and Leo O'Hara
Defendant: Bluff City Ice, Inc. and Carl Hughes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00062
Filed: April 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motions to dismiss defendant Hughes (#65) and Count II of their complaint (#64) are GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED defendant Carl Hughes is DISMISSED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at defendant Hughess motions for summary judgment (#52) and to dismiss (#55) are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff OHaras claim for violations of the Missouri Minimum Wage Law (Count II) is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that defendant Bluff City Ices motion for summary judgment (#47) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that summary judgment is GRANTED to defendant Bluff City Ice on plaintiffs claims regarding the compensability of on-call time. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/30/15. (MRS)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 39 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Putative Class Contact Information Pursuant to Court Order and for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Jimmy R. Bilskey motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part( Response to Court due by 5/8/2014.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/25/14. (MRS)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 27 MOTION to Certify Class AS FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION, TO ORDER DISCLOSURE OF PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS NAMES AND CONTACT INFORMATION, AND TO FACILITATE CLASS NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Jimmy R. Bilskey motion is GRAN TED..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs proposed notice and consent form are to be modified as set out in the above memorandum, and an revised notice and consent form shall be filed with the Court no later than February 10, 2014.( Response to Court due by 2/10/2014.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/29/14. (MRS)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 23 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Jimmy R. Bilskey motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.. plaintiffs' motion is DENIED as moot with respect to items 1, 2, 3, and 6. plaintiffs' motion is DENIED as to item 4. plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED as to item 5. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/23/14. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilskey et al v. Bluff City Ice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy R. Bilskey
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Mark A. Koupal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo O'Hara
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Mark A. Koupal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluff City Ice, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Yarbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?