Tucker v. Karol
Plaintiff: Norman Tucker
Defendant: Patricia Karol
Case Number: 1:2015cv00017
Filed: January 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: St. Genevieve
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF #22) is GRANTED. A separate judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/1/2015. (JMC)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF # 20) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/11/2015. (JMC)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall modify docket number six to show that summons was returned unexecuted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process on the complaint. The Clerk shall notify the Marshals Office that the first attempt at service did not comply with Rule 4(e), and the Clerk shall direct the Marshals Office to serve defendant in accordance with the Rule. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/25/2015. (JMC)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 7 PRO SE MOTION Court Order and For Access to the Court filed by Plaintiff Norman Tucker. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Geitzs motion for court order for access to the Court [ECF No. 7] is ordered STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/18/15. (MRS)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Norman Tucker motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/9/15. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Karol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Karol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?