Harris v. Corizon et al
Plaintiff: Jim Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Corizon, Ian Wallace, George A. Lombardi, Ernest W. Jackson, R. Eric Bessey and Pat Roes 1 - 5
Case Number: 1:2015cv00026
Filed: February 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 129 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an Order from the Court directing the Missouri Department of Corrections to stop taking funds from his prison account to pay filing fees for this matter, and to reimburse him for funds already deducted [ECF No. 129] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/23/20. (CSG)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 126 MOTION for Reconsideration re 122 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal) filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/28/18. (MRS)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 104 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Defendant R. Eric Bessey, 103 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Defendant Corizon, LLC, Defendant Corizon Health, Inc., Defendant Corizon, Inc., D efendant Ernest W. Jackson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motions for summary judgment (#66, #69) are GRANTED as to plaintiff's claim that the defendants were deliberately indifferent to plaintiff's medical needs by prescr ibing plaintiff penicillin when he was allergic to it. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motions to change trial date (#103, #104) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel are directed to submit new proposed trial dates as soon as possible. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/13/17. (CSG)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the separate motions for summary judgment filed by defendant Dr. R. Eric Bessey [Doc. #66] and by defendants Ernest W. Jackson, D.D.M., Corizon LLC, Corizon Health, Inc. and Corizon, Inc. [Doc. #69] ar e denied with respect to plaintiff's claim of delay in prescribing and administering effective antibiotics and claim of disregarding plaintiffs allergy to penicillin asserted in Counts I and II.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motions for summary are granted with respect to all other claims asserted in Counts I and II. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/17/2017. (JMC)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 49 Joint MOTION to Strike and Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Robert L. Ward, DDS filed by Defendant Corizon, LLC, Defendant Corizon Health, Inc., Defendant R. Eric Bessey, Defendant Corizon, Inc., Defenda nt Ernest W. Jackson motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall have until February 1, 2016, to submit a verified statement of attorneys fees reasonably incurred in seeking Dr. Wards deposition and in bringing their motion to strike.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/21/16. (MRS)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendants George Lombardi and Ian Wallace to dismiss [Doc. #27] is granted. An order of partial dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/21/2015. (JMC)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jim Harris, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis[Doc. #6] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.03 on or before April 12, 2015. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: ( 1) his name; (2) his prison registrationnumber; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until April 12, 2015 to file an amended complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated casemanagement system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/13/2015, Response to Court due by 4/13/2015.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/11/15. (CSG)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Procee d in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Courtprovidedform within (30) days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account s tatement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 3/6/2015.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/4/15. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Corizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Eric Bessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Roes 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?