Mosley et al v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: |
Janet Mosley, Nevada Mosley, Breanna Mosley, Andre Mosley and Christopher Mosley |
Defendant: |
State of Missouri, Corizon, Inc., Ian Wallace, Travis Wilhite, Donna Spaven and Does 1-20 |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00052 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the aspect of the motion (Doc. No. 13) of the State of Missouri to dismiss the state law claims against it is GRANTED. All claims against the State of Missouri having been dismissed, the Clerks Office shall terminate the State of Missouri as a Defendant in this action. State of Missouri terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/11/15. (MRS)
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant State of Missouri, Defendant Travis Wilhite, Defendant Ian Wallace motion is GRANTED IN PART..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (Doc . No. 13) of Defendants Stateof Missouri, and Ian Wallace and Travis Wilhite in their official capacity, to dismiss thecomplaint as to them is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs claims under § 1983, andwith respect to Plaintiffs state law claims against Defendants Wallace and Wilhite intheir official capacity.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May6, 2015, to amend their complaint to plead facts that would establish that the State of Missouri has waived its sovereign immunity with respect to the state law claims against it. The Court will reserve ruling on the present motion to dismiss with respect to the state law claims against the State until that date, and if an amended complaint is filed, will give the State the opportunity to supplement its motion to dismiss.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/6/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/17/15. (MRS)
|
April 3, 2015 |
Filing
28
CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - On 4/2/15, the Court entered an Order directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the Southeastern Division. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and randomly assigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:15cv52. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:14cv1688 CAS be administratively closed. (BAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?