Jefferson v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Elmer Lee Jefferson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin and SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2015cv00097
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Mummert
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will adopt the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge in part, to the extent that it recommends remand of this matter, but will remand with directions for the ALJ to d evelop the record fully and fairly with respect toplaintiff's challenge to the calculation of his SSI benefits as set forth herein. [Doc. 41] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties objections to the Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED and pl aintiff's "Application of Estoppel" and request for summary judgment are DENIED. [Doc. 42] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum and Order. An appropriate judgment of remand will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/28/2016. (JMC)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order filed by Elmer Lee Jefferson - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Objection, docketed as a motion for reconsideration, is DENIED. [Doc. 28] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as previously ordered, plaintiff shall file a Brief in support of his Complaint by April 11, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to timely file a Brief in support of his Complaint as required by this Order and the Order of March 10, 2016, will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice by the undersigned, without further notice. See Rule 41(b) ofthe Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/29/2016. (JMC)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a Social Security Complaint form. Plaintiff must complete the form and return it to the Court within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to substitute Carolyn W. Colvin as defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 6/9/2015. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Lee Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?