Harris v. Kempker et al
Plaintiff: Ira B. Harris
Defendant: Gary Kempker, Ian Wallace, Corizon Medical Services, Inc., George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Dr. Unknown Nakra, Linda Little, Dr. Unknown McKinley, Dr. Unknown Gavin, Brandi Puden, Norma Helbring, Robin Allen, Heather Reese, Suzy Unknown, Heather Conrad, Lisa Unknown, Dr. Unknown Eppolito, Dr. Unknown Hill, Ryan Unknown, Megan Unknown, David Null, Unknown Thurston, Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health, Anne L. Precythe, Keith Schafer, Corizon, LLC, Brandi Juden, Cynthia Reese, M.D. John Eppolito, Nina Hill, William McKinney and Mark Stringer
Case Number: 1:2015cv00140
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 295 MANDATE of USCA USCA #:21-1546 In accordance with the judgment and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. Judgment of the District Court is affirmed.(MRS)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER of USCA as to #283 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris, #278 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris USCA Appeal #: 21-1546 The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied(MRS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 293 USCA JUDGMENT as to #283 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris, #278 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris..This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court and briefs of the parties.After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.Appellants pending motions are denied. (MRS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 292 OPINION from USCA re #283 Notice of Appeal, #278 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 21-1546 judgment of the district court is affirmed (Attachments: #1 Counsel Letter)(MRS)
July 22, 2021 Filing 291 Letter from Financial Specialist re:reimbursement of fees and costs (MRS)
July 12, 2021 Filing 290 LETTER/DOCUMENT FILED from USCA re #283 Notice of Appeal, #278 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 21-1546.(CSG)
June 8, 2021 Filing 289 Letter to Ira Harris from Deputy Clerk Schaefer informing him his check in the amount of $16.50 and copy request has been forwarded to the Court of Appeals (MRS)
May 21, 2021 Filing 288 Letter to the Court from Ira Harris re:requesting copy of document #267 (copy sent to Harris) (MRS)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. MOTION IS GRANTED AND APPROVED BY THE COURT ON BANC. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/19/21. (MRS)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #285 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Court Appointed Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Paulson, Jennifer) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/24/21. (MRS)
March 23, 2021 Filing 285 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Court Appointed Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Paulson, Jennifer)
March 23, 2021 Filing 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Request for Compensation and and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Hours Final, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - In Court Hourly Worksheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Out of Court Time Worksheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-1 - Expert Costs, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-2 - Deposition Costs, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E-3 - Mileage Costs, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E-4 - Securus Costs, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E-5 - Filing Fees)(Paulson, Jennifer)
March 16, 2021 Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #277 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal) by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
March 15, 2021 Filing 282 Letter to Court from Harris re:requesting copy of docket sheet (copy of docket sheet sent to Harris on 3/18/21) (MRS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 281 Briefing Schedule from USCA for #278 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris USCA Appeal Number: 21-1546 (See attached document for all other deadlines.)(MRS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 280 Initial Notification from USCA for #278 Notice of Appeal filed by Ira B. Harris USCA Appeal Number: 21-1546 (Attachments: #1 Pro Se NDA)(MRS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 279 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #278 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 3/5/21 by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MRS)
March 5, 2021 Filing 278 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOEDC-8515419.
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER AND JUDGMENT - This matter having come before the Court, and the Court having rendered a decision,IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Courts Order dated August 25, 2015, Defendants Gary Kempker, Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Dr. Unknown Gavin Brandi Puden, Norma Helbring, Robin Allen, Heather Conrad, Suzy Unknown, Lisa Unknown, Ryan Unknown, Megan Unknown, and Unknown Thurston were dismissed from this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Courts Order dated December 14, 2015, Dr. Unknown Nakra was dismissed from this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Second Amended Complaint dated August 25, 2017, Defendants Linda Little, Dr. Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese, Dr. Unknown Eppolito, and Dr. Unknown Hill were dismissed from this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Courts Order dated December 5, 2017, Defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health, and Keith Schafer were dismissed from this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Courts Order dated March 13, 2020, interlocutory summary judgment was entered in favor of Defendants Corizon, LLC, M.D. Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Ian Wallace, Troy Steele, and George Lombardi on Count II, in favor of Defendants Mark Stringer and Anne Precythe on Count IV, and in favor of Defendants Corizon, LLC, George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Cynthia Reese, Ian Wallace, and Troy Steele on Count I. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Count IV, dated March 18, 2020, Count IV against Corizon, LLC was dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, dated February 19, 2021, Counts II and III against Defendant David Null were dismissed.The interlocutory summary judgment order dated March 13, 2020 is now final for purposes of appeal. All other claims have been dismissed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/22/21. (MRS)
February 19, 2021 Filing 276 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Paulson, Jennifer)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Docket Text ORDER: Status Conference by phone held this day with the Court. Counsel for all parties participating.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/2/21. (MRS)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/2/2021 11:15 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/26/21. (MRS)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTING, Attorney Stephen Mark Hoeplinger terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/19/2021. (CMH)
January 18, 2021 Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 271 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer M Paulson for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Paulson, Jennifer)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER re #243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) filed by Ira B. Harris DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/30/20. (MRS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) Regarding Evidence of Mental Illness filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 21, 2020 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #243 MOTION in Limine < Incorrect document filed. Attorney re-field correct document and it carries doc 269
December 21, 2020 Filing 267 RESPONSE to Motion re #243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross-Examining Plaintiff Using His Statements of Mental Incapacity filed by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SCHEDULING ORDER: On the Courts own motion due to COVID-19, the March 4, 2021 trial date isreset for March 17, 2021. Jury Trial re-set for 3/17/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B - Cape before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/11/20. (CSG)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #264 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Heidi Johnson by Defendant David Null. (Johnson, Heidi) filed by David Null ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/23/20. (MRS)
November 20, 2020 Filing 264 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Heidi Johnson by Defendant David Null. (Johnson, Heidi)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM in Southeast Division - Cape Girardeau before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Pretrial Compliance due by 12/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/20/20. (MRS)
November 19, 2020 Filing 262 RESPONSE to Motion re #243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) filed by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 261 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward V. Crites for Defendant David Null. (Crites, Edward)
November 12, 2020 Filing 260 MOTION in Limine Regarding Visual Appearance At Trial by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference reset for 11/20/2020 11:30 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/5/20. (MRS)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER re #257 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date filed by David Null GRANTED( Jury Trial reset for 12/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B - Cape before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.., Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 11:30 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr..). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/2/20. (MRS)
October 30, 2020 Filing 257 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Defendant David Null. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blanton, Mark)
October 27, 2020 Filing 256 RESPONSE to Motion re #250 MOTION in Limine and Suggestions in Support filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:15 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/27/20. (MRS)
October 26, 2020 Filing 254 Deposition Designations by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris.. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 253 MEMORANDUM re #249 Response to Court Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 252 OBJECTION to Pretrial re #228 Deposition Designations by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. Related document: #228 Deposition Designations filed by David Null.(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 251 OBJECTION to Pretrial re #237 Exhibit List of Defendant David Null by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. Related document: #237 Exhibit List filed by David Null.(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 250 MOTION in Limine and Suggestions in Support by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 249 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Requesting Briefing on Damages by Defendant David Null. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blanton, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 248 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 247 OBJECTION to Pretrial re #231 Sealed Document Defendant David Null's Written Objections to Plaintiff Ira Harris's Deposition Designations by Defendant David Null. Related document: #231 Sealed Document filed by Ira B. Harris.(Blanton, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 246 Exhibit List - Defendant David Null's Written Objections to Plaintiff Ira Harris's Exhibits by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM Regarding Appropriate Measure of Damages and Related Instructions by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Instructions on Damages)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 244 SEALED DOCUMENT re #243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) Defendant's Exhibit D by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 243 MOTION in Limine (Consolidated) by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Edgar Affidavit)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 23, 2020 Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to Submit Proposed Jury Instruction Out of Time by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Instruction, #2 Exhibit B - Email)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 22, 2020 Filing 241 ENTRY of Appearance by Heidi J Johnson for Defendant David Null. (Johnson, Heidi)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is set for status conference by telephone on Friday, October 23, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel participating in the conference should call the Courts conference line at 1-866-434-5269, access code: 2082948. Status Conference set for 10/23/2020 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/21/20. (MRS)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/26/2020 03:00 PM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/21/20. (MRS)
October 16, 2020 Filing 238 Exhibit List (Amended) by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 237 Exhibit List by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 16, 2020 Filing 236 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 16, 2020 Filing 235 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 234 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 233 Exhibit List by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 232 WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 231 SEALED DOCUMENT Deposition Designations by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 230 Stipulation of Uncontested Facts by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 229 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 16, 2020 Filing 228 Deposition Designations by Defendant David Null.. (Blanton, Mark)
October 16, 2020 Filing 227 WITNESS LIST by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
October 6, 2020 WRIT Issued ; Type of Writ Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum #225 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum WRIT FAXED TO JCC RECORDS DEPARTMENT (MRS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Docket Text ORDER: Petition for issuance of writ ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/20. (MRS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 225 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum as to Ira B. Harris for November 5, 2020.. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #206 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Coffman filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to exclude [#206] is DENIED. Dated this 24th day of June, 2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 06/24/20. (CMH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 223 STATUS REPORT by David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Docket Text ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Division - Cape Girardeau before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Status Report due by 5/26/2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/26/20. (MRS)
March 26, 2020 Filing 221 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 3/26/2020. (proceedings started: 10:00) (proceedings ended: 10:05)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Stephen Hoeplinger)(Appearance for Defendant: Mark Blanton) (MRS)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #218 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Amy E. Oslica by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/25/20. (MRS)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Docket Text ORDER:: Status conference reset for Thursday, March 26, 2020 at 10:00a.m. Counsel should call into the Courts conference call line at 866-434-5269, access code: 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/24/20. (MRS)
March 24, 2020 Filing 218 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Amy E. Oslica by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kelley F. Farrell by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Farrell, Kelley) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Kelley Field Farrell terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/20/20. (MRS)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Docket Text ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 02:30 PM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr..Counsel should call in to the Courts conference call line at 1-866-434-5269, access code: 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/19/20. (MRS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 215 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 3/19/2020. (proceedings started: 2:30) (proceedings ended: 2:52)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Stephen Hoeplinger)(Appearance for Defendant: Mark Blanton & Dwight Vermette) (MRS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 214 ENTRY of Appearance by Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr for Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Vermette, Dwight)
March 19, 2020 Filing 213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kelley F. Farrell by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Farrell, Kelley)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Docket Text ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:30 PM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Counsel shall call into the Courts conference call line at 866-434-5269, access code: 2082948.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/19/20. (MRS)
March 18, 2020 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM re #208 Order, by Defendant David Null. (Blanton, Mark)
March 18, 2020 Filing 210 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Count IV Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
March 18, 2020 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM re #208 Order, Regarding Viability of Remaining Claims by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re #207 Memorandum & Order, Supplemental to the Memorandum and Order entered today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing ordered by the Court should address whether the remaining claims are still viable. In the interim, the deadlines imposed by the Case Management Order are stayed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/20. (MRS)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions for summary judgment and partial summary judgment (#161, #166, #171) are GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by March 18, 2020, the parties shall file simultaneous briefing regarding the remaining claims in light of this Court's decision( Response to Court due by 3/18/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/20. (MRS)
March 11, 2020 Filing 206 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Coffman by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - IRR, #3 Exhibit C - Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Email)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #204 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial Date, or In the Alternative, to Allow Depositions of Unavailable Witnesses to Preserve Testimony by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris ;Motion to Continue ORDERED DENIED; motion to allow depositions of unavailable witnesses to preserve testimony GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/22/20. (MRS)
January 22, 2020 Filing 204 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial Date, or In the Alternative, to Allow Depositions of Unavailable Witnesses to Preserve Testimony by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #199 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to File Document Under Seal by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark) filed by George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Anne L. Precythe, David Null, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/22/20. (MRS)
January 21, 2020 Filing 202 SEALED DOCUMENT re #200 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendants Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace, David Null, George Lombardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Blanton, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 201 RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re #173 Statement of Material Facts, filed by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re #171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Blanton, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 199 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to File Document Under Seal by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 198 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ;Proposed extension date 01/21/20 by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #191 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.) filed by Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/15/20. (CSG)
January 14, 2020 Filing 196 NOTICE by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney re #163 Statement of Material Facts, #186 Sealed Document,, Defendants McKinney, Eppolito, Hill, Juden and Corizon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to their Statement of Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q - Juden Deposition, #2 Exhibit R - Eppolito Deposition, #3 Exhibit S - E-mail message, #4 Exhibit T - E-mail message, #5 Exhibit U - Affidavit of Joan Monninger, #6 Exhibit V - E-mail message, #7 Exhibit W - E-mail message)(Eckenrode, J.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants William McKinney, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, and Corizon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to our Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 194 SEALED DOCUMENT re #193 Notice (Other), Exhibit L - Medical Records by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese re #184 Sealed Document,, Defendants Cynthia Reese and Corizon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Statement of Material Facts and Response to Plaintiff's Additional Material Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Topics of Testimony, #2 Exhibit M - Reese Deposition)(Eckenrode, J.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Cynthia Reese and Corizon, LLC's Reply to plaintiff's response to their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #189 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of: CORIZON DEFENDANTS CONSENTED-TO MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.) filed by Corizon, LLC, Nina Hill, Cynthia Reese, John Eppolito, Brandi Juden, William McKinney ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/20. (MRS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 189 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of: CORIZON DEFENDANTS CONSENTED-TO MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 188 SEALED DOCUMENT re #174 Sealed Document, Response to Statement of Material Facts by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Steele Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Wallace Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 3 - IS 11-01, #4 Exhibit 4 - Harris Dep. Tr., #5 Exhibit 5 - 11.25.14 letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1.22.15 letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - 7.8.15 letter, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7.17.15 letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - Juden Dep. Tr., #10 Exhibit 10 - 7.27.15 letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - Emergency IRR, #12 Exhibit 12 - IRR Response, #13 Exhibit 13 - SOP 11-01)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 186 SEALED DOCUMENT re #163 Statement of Material Facts Response to Statement of Material Facts by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Taylor Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Harris Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 3 - IS11-38, #4 Exhibit 4 - IRR, #5 Exhibit 5 - Al-Haddad Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 - Grievance, #7 Exhibit 7 - HSR, #8 Exhibit 8 - Eppolito Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit 9 - Tubbs Dep. Tr., #10 Exhibit 10 - Juden Dep. Tr., #11 Exhibit 11 - Al-Haddad Dep. Tr.)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 184 SEALED DOCUMENT re #168 Statement of Material Facts Response to Statement of Material Facts by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tubbs Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Harris Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 3 - NF Request, #4 Exhibit 4 - Eyman Dep. Tr., #5 Exhibit 5 - MH Notes, #6 Exhibit 6 - HSR, #7 Exhibit 7 - Reese Dep. Tr., #8 Exhibit 8 - HSR, #9 Exhibit 9 - IRR Response, #10 Exhibit 10 - Taylor Dep. Tr., #11 Exhibit 11 - HSR)(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 183 RESPONSE to Motion re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #181 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris, GRANTED #180 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/30/19. (MRS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 27, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #178 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/11/19. Response due 12/31/19(MRS)
December 10, 2019 Filing 178 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #160 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.) filed by Corizon, LLC, Nina Hill, John Eppolito, Brandi Juden, William McKinney ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/3/19. (MRS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #165 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.) filed by Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/3/19. (MRS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #170 MOTION to Seal Document "Defendants Anne Precythe, Mark Stringer, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and David Null's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal" by Defendants David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark) filed by Troy Steele, Anne L. Precythe, David Null, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/3/19. (MRS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 174 SEALED DOCUMENT re #173 Statement of Material Facts, by Defendants Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace, David Null. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Blanton, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 173 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G & H)(Blanton, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 170 MOTION to Seal Document "Defendants Anne Precythe, Mark Stringer, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and David Null's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal" by Defendants David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 169 SEALED DOCUMENT re #168 Statement of Material Facts Exhibit A - Mental Health Records by Defendant Cynthia Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Deposition of Cynthia Reese, #2 Exhibit C - Deposition of Dr. Eyman, #3 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Cynthia Reese, #4 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Dr. Al-Haddad, #5 Exhibit F - Medical Records, #6 Exhibit G - Grievances, #7 Exhibit H - MDOC Procedural Manual D5-3.2, #8 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Dr. Tubbs, #9 Exhibit J - Deposition of Ira Harris)(Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 168 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, Cynthia Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 164 SEALED DOCUMENT re #163 Statement of Material Facts Exhibit A - Medical Records by Defendants William McKinney, Corizon, LLC, Brandi Juden, John Eppolito, Nina Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Excerpts of medical records, #2 Exhibit C - Grievances, #3 Exhibit D - Excerpts of mental health records, #4 Exhibit E - Deposition of Dr. Eppolito, #5 Exhibit F - Deposition of Nina Hill, #6 Exhibit G - Deposition of Brandi Juden, #7 Exhibit H - Deposition of Cynthia Reese, #8 Exhibit I - Deposition of Dr. McKinney, #9 Exhibit J - Deposition of Dr. Eyman, #10 Exhibit K - Affidavit of Dr. Tubbs, #11 Exhibit L - Affidavit of Dr. Eisner, #12 Exhibit M - Depositon of Dr. Al-Haddad, #13 Exhibit N - Deposition of Ira Harris, #14 Exhibit O - Affidavit of Dr. McKinney, #15 Exhibit P - Affidavit of Cindy Schupp)(Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 163 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.)
December 2, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney. (Eckenrode, J.)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RELATING TO TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 4/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B - Cape before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Motion in Limine due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/20/2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/21/19. (MRS)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #157 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark) filed by George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Anne L. Precythe, David Null, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/18/19. (MRS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 157 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #155 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Justin C. Moore by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin) filed by George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Anne L. Precythe, David Null, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/10/19. (MRS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Justin C. Moore by Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 154 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Blanton for Defendants George Lombardi, David Null, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Blanton, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #152 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Discovery completion deadline - 10/18/19. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/12/19. (MRS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 152 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 151 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen Mark Hoeplinger for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 4/9/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/20/2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/21/19. (MRS)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #148 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #147 Case Management Order - Amended, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED( Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2019.) Trial date to be set at a later date by separate order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/15/19. (MRS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #147 Case Management Order - Amended, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #146 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris motion is GRANTED( Discovery Completion due by 8/15/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2019., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.., Pretrial Compliance due by 1/14/2020., Motion in Limine due by 1/24/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/3/19. (MRS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/19. (MRS)
January 8, 2019 Filing 144 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Moore, Justin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 143 Request for Copy of docket sheet by Ira Harris.( copy sent as requested)(MRS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER( Motion to Join Parties due by 9/15/2018., Discovery Completion due by 10/1/2018., Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.., Pretrial Compliance due by 12/17/2019., Motion in Limine due by 12/27/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/21/2018. (JMC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 141 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Proposed Amended CMO)(Oslica, Amy)
June 29, 2018 Filing 140 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint by George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer.(Moore, Justin)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections, Defendant Missouri Department of Mental Health, #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer filed by Defendant Keith Schafer, Defendant George Lombardi, Defendant Troy Steele, Defendant Anne L. Precythe, Defendant Ian Wallace, #131 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Mark Stringer filed by Defendant George Lombardi, Defendant Troy Steele, Defendant Anne L. Precythe, Defendant Mark Stringer, Defendant Ian Wallace. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (#131) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts I and II are dismissed as to defendants Lombardi, Precythe, Steele, and Wallace in their official capacities only. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendants Lombardi, Precythe, Steele, and Wallace's motion to dismiss (#111) and the subsequently-dismissed parties' motion to dismiss (#113), both filed November 13, 2017, are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/15/18. (CSG)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #137 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Michael P. Benson by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/9/18. (MRS)
May 8, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Michael P. Benson by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #135 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kevin K. Peek by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Peek, Kevin) filed by Corizon, LLC, Nina Hill, Cynthia Reese, John Eppolito, Brandi Juden, William McKinney ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Kevin K. Peek terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/19/18. (MRS)
March 16, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kevin K. Peek by Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Peek, Kevin)
March 5, 2018 Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Stringer served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (MRS)
February 14, 2018 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re #131 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Mark Stringer filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
February 7, 2018 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #131 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Mark Stringer filed by Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
February 7, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Mark Stringer by Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Mark Stringer, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
February 7, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint by David Null.(Moore, Justin)
February 7, 2018 Filing 129 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin C. Moore for Defendant Mark Stringer. (Moore, Justin)
February 6, 2018 Filing 128 ANSWER to #126 Amended Complaint by Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese.(Eckenrode, J.)
January 25, 2018 Filing 127 Summons Issued as to defendant Mark Stringer. The summons was hand delivered to USM Office - Cape. (MRS)
January 24, 2018 Filing 126 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants , filed by Ira B. Harris.(Benson, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris to SCCC Licking. (MRS)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #122 MOTION for Leave to Join an Additional Party and to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED there being no objection filed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/15/17. (MRS)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Docket Text ORDER: granting voluntary dismissal of defendats Schafer, Dept of Mental Health and Dept of Corrections, Keith Schafer, Missouri Department of Corrections and Missouri Department of Mental Health terminated without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/5/17. (MRS)
December 4, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Join an Additional Party and to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
December 4, 2017 Filing 121 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
December 4, 2017 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
December 4, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ira B. Harris of Defendants Keith Schafer, Missouri Department of Mental Health, and Missouri Department of Corrections (Benson, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keith Schafer served on 11/17/2017, answer due 12/8/2017. (MRS)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #116 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections, #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy) filed by Ira B. Harris ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/17/17. RESPONSE DUE 12/4/17(MRS)
November 17, 2017 Filing 116 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections, #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy)
November 13, 2017 Filing 115 ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint,, by David Null.(Moore, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections filed by Defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Moore, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri Department of Mental Health and Missouri Department of Corrections by Defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Moore, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer filed by Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Keith Schafer, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss Party George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, and Keith Schafer by Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Keith Schafer, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
November 3, 2017 Filing 110 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin C. Moore for Defendant Unknown Null. (Moore, Justin)
November 3, 2017 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Missouri Department of Corrections, Ian Wallace, Unknown Null, George Lombardi Anne L. Precythe waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; Troy Steele waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; Missouri Department of Corrections waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; Ian Wallace waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; Unknown Null waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; George Lombardi waiver signed on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Moore, Justin)
October 27, 2017 Filing 108 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin C. Moore for Defendants George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Keith Schafer, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace. (Moore, Justin)
October 27, 2017 Filing 107 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Keith Schafer. The summons was mailed to US Marshal's Office. (MRS)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Docket Text ORDER: granting request for issuance of an Alias Summons. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/27/17. (MRS)
October 25, 2017 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM Request for Alias Summons by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
October 25, 2017 Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #93 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Moore, Justin) filed by Missouri Department of Mental Health ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/12/17. (MRS)
October 11, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #93 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Moore, Justin)
October 11, 2017 Filing 101 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin C. Moore for Defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Moore, Justin)
October 4, 2017 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed Missouri Department of Mental Health served on 9/22/2017, answer due 10/13/2017. (MRS)
October 4, 2017 Filing 99 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Keith Schafer. Schafer no longer works for the Mo Dept of Mental Health. Forwarding information is unknown (MRS)
September 11, 2017 Filing 98 Summons Issued as to defendant Missouri Department of Mental Health, Keith Schafer. The summons was mailed to USM Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Schafer)(MRS)
September 11, 2017 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE LETTER from clerk As to Defendants: Missouri Department of Corrections, George Lombardi, Anne Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace and Unknown Null (MRS)
September 7, 2017 Filing 96 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin K. Peek for Defendants Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese. (Peek, Kevin)
September 7, 2017 Filing 95 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Defendants Corizon, LLC, Brandi Juden. (Eckenrode, J.)
September 5, 2017 Filing 94 ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint,, by Corizon, LLC, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, Brandi Juden, William McKinney, Cynthia Reese.(Eckenrode, J.)
August 25, 2017 Filing 93 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Department of Mental Health, George Lombardi, Anne L. Precythe, Troy Steele, Ian Wallace, Keith Schafer, Corizon, LLC, Brandi Juden, Unknown Null, Cynthia Reese, John Eppolito, Nina Hill, William McKinney, Terminating Linda Little (Nurse, Potosi Correctional Center), Unknown McKinley (Doctor at Potosi Correctional Center), Heather Reese (Chief Psychologist, SECC), Unknown Eppolito (Doctor, SECC) and Unknown Hill (Doctor, SECC) Amendment to #12 Amended Complaint, #1 DCM Complaint, filed by Ira B. Harris. Related document: #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Ira B. Harris, #1 DCM Complaint, filed by Ira B. Harris.(CSG)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #91 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and to Join Additional Parties as Defendants and to Dismiss Certain Parties as Defendants by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Farrell, Kelley) filed by Ira B. Harris; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/25/17. (CSG)
August 25, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and to Join Additional Parties as Defendants and to Dismiss Certain Parties as Defendants by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Farrell, Kelley)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #79 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris, #84 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris, #89 MOTION to Strike #84 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Linda Little, Defendant Unknown Hill, Defendant Unknown McKinley, Defendant Unknown Eppolito, Defendant Heather Reese. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to amend and supplement the complaint (#79, #84) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/30/17. (CSG)
May 18, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION to Strike #84 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint,, by Defendants Unknown Eppolito, Unknown Hill, Linda Little, Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
May 2, 2017 Filing 88 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy E. Oslica for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Oslica, Amy)
May 2, 2017 Filing 87 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Patrick Benson for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Benson, Michael)
May 2, 2017 Filing 86 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelley Field Farrell for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Farrell, Kelley)
May 2, 2017 Filing 85 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Blitz for Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Blitz, Robert)
April 25, 2017 Filing 84 PRO SE MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
April 20, 2017 ***REMARK - copy of document #83 sent to Plaintiff at ERDCC. (CSG)
April 18, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL. Pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, the Clerk of the Court hereby notifies Robert D. Blitz, BLITZ AND BARDGETT, that he is appointed to serve as Pro Bono Counsel on behalf of the plaintiff in the above-styled action. The Clerk of the Court shall provide appointed counsel with a copy of the complete Court file. (CSG)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ketrina G. Bakewell terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/7/17. (CSG)
April 7, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE Withdrawal: by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris re #80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney As Court Appointed Counsel ;attorney/firm Ketrina G. Bakewell/Bryan Cave LLP (Bakewell, Ketrina)
April 7, 2017 Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney As Court Appointed Counsel ;attorney/firm Ketrina G. Bakewell/Bryan Cave LLP by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bakewell, Ketrina)
April 7, 2017 ***REMARK - An e-mail request for volunteer from the Pro Bono Panel issued this day due to appointed counsel withdrawal. (CSG)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 82. Fri Apr 7 15:13:16 CDT 2017 (Gould, Cathy)
March 16, 2017 Filing 79 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Mental Health Records, #2 Envelope)(MRS) (Main Document 79 replaced on 3/17/2017) (JMC).
March 16, 2017 Filing 78 Record Transmittal: The court record has been forwared to: Ketrina Bakewell. (CSG)
March 16, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL. Pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, the Clerk of the Court hereby notifies Ketrina G. Bakewell, BRYAN CAVE, 211 North Broadway, Suite 3600, St. Louis, MO 63102, 314-259-2236, kgbakewell@bryancave.com that she is appointed to serve as Pro Bono Counsel on behalf of the plaintiff in the above-styled action. The Clerk of the Court shall provide appointed counsel with a copy of the complete Court file. (CSG)
March 16, 2017 ***REMARK: copy of document #77 sent to plaintiff at ERDCC. (CSG)
March 8, 2017 ***REMARK - E-mail sent to the Pro Bono Appointment Panel seeking a volunteer. (CSG)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #75 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris motion is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall appoint counsel pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/7/17. (MRS)
March 7, 2017 ***REMARK - COPY OF ORDER dated 3/7/17 forwarded to Ira Harris (MRS)
March 6, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION to Appoint NEW Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MRS)
March 6, 2017 Filing 74 Request for Status Report by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Docket sheet has been previously mailed- copy of status report filed with the court in Jan forwarded to Harris) (MRS)
February 21, 2017 Filing 73 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Ira B. Harris re:requesting copy of docket sheet. (copy sent to Mr. Harris at ERDCC, Bonne Terre, MO) (CSG) Modified on 2/22/2017 (MRS).
January 12, 2017 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT by Ira B. Harris. (Hackworth, Michael)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Docket Text ORDER: The parties shall file a report with the Court regarding the status of this matter within 14 days, ( Status Report due by 1/12/2017.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/29/16. (MRS)
November 8, 2016 ***REMARK..copy of Order issued 11/7/16 mailed to Ira Harris at ERDCC (MRS)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to re-appoint counsel, motion to appoint guardian ad litem, and motion for protective order (#65, #66, #67) are DENIED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/7/16. (MRS)
October 5, 2016 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT STATUS REPORT by Ira B. Harris. (Hackworth, Michael)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: ORDERED - The parties shall file a status report with the Court within 7 days ( Response to Court due by 10/5/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/28/2016. (JMC)
September 2, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Letter to SNLJ, #2 Correspondence)(MRS)
September 2, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
September 2, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
August 22, 2016 ***REMARK The address for attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode has been updated. (LMR)
August 19, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode. (Eckenrode, J.)
April 28, 2016 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
April 28, 2016 ***REMARK- Copy of docket sheet forwarded to Harris. Harris is advised that any further correspondence should be filed through his attorney. (MRS)
March 31, 2016 Filing 62 Request for Copy of docket sheet by Harris. (copy of docket sheet forwarded to Harris at Bonne Terre) (MRS) Modified on 4/1/2016 (MRS).
March 22, 2016 Filing 61 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason M. Cox. m Modified on 3/22/2016 (MRS).
March 17, 2016 Filing 60 ENTRY of Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff by Michael J. Hackworth. (Hackworth, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2016 (CSG).
March 15, 2016 Filing 59 Record Transmittal: The court record has been forwared to: Michael J. Hackworth by e-mail. (CSG)
March 15, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL. Pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, the Clerk of the Court hereby notifies Michael J. Hackworth, HACKWORTH, FERGUSON & THOMPSON, LLC, that he is appointed to serve as Pro Bono Counsel on behalf of the plaintiff in the above-styled action. The Clerk of the Court shall provide appointed counsel with a copy of the complete Court file. (CSG)
March 15, 2016 ***REMARK - Copy of Document #58 sent to plaintiff at ERDCC, Bonne Terre, MO. (CSG)
March 3, 2016 Filing 57 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
March 3, 2016 Filing 56 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE: PRO BONO VOLUNTEER SERVICE PANEL APPOINTMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #52 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint counsel pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. A separate Notice of Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel shall be entered by the Clerk. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (MRS)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Supplement ; granting in part and denying in part #52 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #53 Motion to Supplement. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint counsel pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. ( SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (MRS) Modified on 3/3/2016 (MRS).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 55. Thu Mar 3 12:03:27 CST 2016 (Schaefer, Michelle)
February 11, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
January 14, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Examination - Mental by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 5B, Prisoner Motion to Join Parties due by 2/17/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2016.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/17/15. (MRS)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 51. Thu Dec 17 12:37:01 CST 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
December 16, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Cover Letter)(MRS)
December 14, 2015 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 PART 2)(MRS)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #43 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris, #41 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for guardian ad litem [ECF No. 41] is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to supplement [ECF No. 43] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/15. (CSG)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris, #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 38, 42] are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/15. (CSG)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Unknown Nakra is DISMISSED without prejudice. Party Unknown Nakra terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/15. (CSG)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Unknown Nakra is DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/15. (CSG)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 45-48. Mon Dec 14 11:34:09 CST 2015 (Gould, Cathy)
December 11, 2015 Filing 44 Letter to Clerk from Harris re:receipt of mail (Attachments: #1 Letter/Mailroom) (MRS)
December 11, 2015 ***REMARK - Ira Harris contacted the court by telephone earlier in the week and Michelle acknowledged receipt of Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Gaurdian Ad Litem. A docket sheet was forwarded to Harris (MRS)
December 4, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 part 1, #2 part 2, #3 Envelope)(MRS)
December 4, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MRS)
December 4, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
November 23, 2015 Filing 40 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Unknown Nakra. (MRS)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must provide the Court with Dr. Nakras service information before December 4, 2015.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss Dr. Nakra without prejudice. Response to Court due by 12/4/2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/19/15. (MRS)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 29,37. Thu Nov 19 08:58:56 CST 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 39. Thu Nov 19 14:20:33 CST 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 18, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
November 18, 2015 Filing 37 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Unknown Nakra. (MRS)
November 13, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris to ERDCC (address corrected in data base) (MRS)
November 2, 2015 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(MRS)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of Guardian ad Litem [ECF No. 8 and 33] are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motions for appointment of counsel [ECF Nos. 4, 13, 21, 32] are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for evidence of tampered grievances [ECF No. 7] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to supplement [ECF No. 31] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/2/15. (MRS)
November 2, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
November 2, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 34. Mon Nov 2 15:49:58 CST 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
October 29, 2015 Filing 31 PRO SE MOTION Amended Supplement by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Envelope)(MRS)
October 29, 2015 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to defendant Unknown Nakra. The summons was mailed to U.S. Marshal's. (MRS)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to attempt service of process on Dr. Unknown Nakra at Missouris Southeast Correctional Center.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/29/15. (MRS)
October 23, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint,, by Unknown Eppolito, Unknown Hill, Linda Little, Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese.(Eckenrode, J.)
October 13, 2015 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Supplement. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/13/15. (MRS)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 26. Tue Oct 13 12:04:22 CDT 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
October 9, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION to Supplement #12 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Pleadings, #2 Letter and Envelope)(CSG)
September 24, 2015 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Little, Unknown Hill, Unknown McKinley, Unknown Eppolito, Heather Reese Linda Little waiver signed on 8/25/2015, answer due 10/26/2015; Unknown Hill waiver signed on 8/25/2015, answer due 10/26/2015; Unknown McKinley waiver signed on 8/25/2015, answer due 10/26/2015; Unknown Eppolito waiver signed on 8/25/2015, answer due 10/26/2015; Heather Reese waiver signed on 8/25/2015, answer due 10/26/2015. (Eckenrode, J.)
September 24, 2015 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Defendants Unknown Eppolito, Unknown Hill, Linda Little, Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese. (Eckenrode, J.)
September 8, 2015 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL/Evidence of Care re #12 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
September 8, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(CSG)
September 3, 2015 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris adding Grievance appeal (MRS)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend [ECF No. 14] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to supplement [ECF No. 15] is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/3/15. (MRS)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19. Thu Sep 3 10:53:51 CDT 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
August 28, 2015 Receipt: $ 350.00, receipt number CAPE002192 Case Filing Fee for Ira Harris. (MRS)
August 25, 2015 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE LETTER from clerk to Stephen D. Brown - Incident.Reports@CorizonHealth.com As to Defendants:Dr. Unknown Nakra, Linda Little, Dr. Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese, Dr. Unknown Eppolito, and Dr. Unknown Hill (MRS)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(B) Party George Lombardi, Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Unknown Gavin (Psyciatrist, Southeast Correctional Center), Norma Helbring (Nursing Director, SECC), George Lombardi (Director, Missouri Department of Corrections), Unknown Null (Corrections Officer, Potosi Correctional Center), Brandi Puden (Health Services Administrator, SECC), Troy Steele (Warden, Potosi Correctional Center), Unknown Thurston (Corrections Officer, SECC), Lisa Unknown (Nurse, SECC), Megan Unknown (Nurse, SECC), Ryan Unknown, Suzy Unknown (CNA, SECC), Ian Wallace (Warden, SECC), Robin Allen (Nursing Director, SECC) and Heather Conrad (Nurse, SECC) terminated without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/25/15. (MRS)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Dr. Unknown Nakra, Linda Little, Dr. Unknown McKinley, Heather Reese, Dr. Unknown Eppolito, and Dr. Unknown Hill, all of whom should be served in accordance with the Courts agreement with Corizon.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Gary Kempker, Ian Wallace, Corizon, George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Dr. Unkown Gavin, Brandi Puden, Norma Helbring, Robin Allen, Suzy Unknown, Heather Conrad, Lisa Unknown, Ryan Unknown, Megan Unknown, Unknown Null, and Unknown Thurston are DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/25/15. (MRS)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16,17. Tue Aug 25 13:00:37 CDT 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
August 25, 2015 ***REMARK - Copy of waiver letter and amended complaint emailed to Incident.Reports@CorizonHealth.com (MRS)
August 24, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to Supplement #1 DCM Complaint with Grievance Appeal by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (MRS)
August 24, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Add Party, MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope and Cover Letter)(MRS)
August 19, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MRS)
August 19, 2015 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Ian Wallace, George Lombardi, Troy Steele, Unknown Nakra, Linda Little, Unknown McKinley, Unknown Gavin, Brandi Puden, Norma Helbring, Robin Allen, Heather Reese, Suzy Unknown, Heather Conrad, Lisa Unknown, Unknown Eppolito, Unknown Hill, Ryan Unknown, Megan Unknown, Unknown Null, Unknown Thurston,Terminating Gary Kempker Amendment to DCM Complaint,, filed by Ira B. Harris. Related document: #10 Memorandum & Order,,, #1 DCM Complaint, filed by Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MRS)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order [ECF No. 5] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/6/2015. (JMC)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $60.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must submit an amended complaint, in compliance with this Order, no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/8/2015., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 9/8/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/6/2015. (JMC)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10,11. Prisoner form forwarded to Mr. Harris Thu Aug 6 10:48:10 CDT 2015 (Carter, Jessica)
August 5, 2015 Filing 9 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (CSG)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Wed Aug 5 11:39:46 CDT 2015 (Gould, Cathy)
August 4, 2015 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG)
August 4, 2015 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Aug 4 16:03:02 CDT 2015 (admin,)
August 4, 2015 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
August 4, 2015 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form # (moed-0041.pdf) consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION Evidence of Tampered Grievances by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 6 DECLARATION in Support filed by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Ira B. Harris. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Gary Kempker, Ian Wallace, filed by Ira B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope)(CSG) Modified on 8/4/2015 (CSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Kempker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira B. Harris
Represented By: Amy E. Dougherty
Represented By: Jason Michael Cox
Represented By: Jennifer M Paulson
Represented By: Kelley Field Farrell
Represented By: Ketrina G. Bakewell
Represented By: Michael J. Hackworth
Represented By: Robert D. Blitz
Represented By: Michael Patrick Benson
Represented By: Stephen M. Hoeplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kempker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lombardi
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Steele
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Nakra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Little
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown McKinley
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Puden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Helbring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Reese
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Eppolito
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Hill
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Null
Represented By: Edward V. Crites
Represented By: Heidi J. Johnson
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Mental Health
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Schafer
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Juden
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Reese
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. John Eppolito
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Hill
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McKinney
Represented By: Dwight Allan Vermette, Sr.
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Kevin K. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stringer
Represented By: Justin C. Moore
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?