White v. Wallace
Plaintiff: Antonio White
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Case Number: 1:2015cv00143
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to clarify [Doc. #8] is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED plaintiffs pleading attached as [Doc. #5] shall be called plaintiffs amended complaint in this proceeding, and the Court i s aware that it relates to allegations that occurred to plaintiff at ERDCC.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter shall be maintained in the Southeastern Division of this Court even though it names defendants who may currently be found in the Courts Eastern Division.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion t o proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six mon th period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Response to Court due by 11/2/2015.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/15. (MRS)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION MEMORANDUM re: 6 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline filed by Plaintiff Antonio White. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file his motion to proceed in forma pauperis and to file his certified ac count statement [Doc. #6] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 fi ling fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison acco unt statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (Response to Court due by 10/19/2015.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/17/15. (CSG)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, as well as a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases.IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that plaintiff's amended complaint in this action shall comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 18 and 20. The filing of plaintiff's amended complaint shall comply, in all other respects, with the guidelines set forth in the Memorandum and Order issued on August 11, 2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/26/15. (CSG)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the C ourt-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff& #039;s request for the Court to order SECC to provide plaintiff with his legal materials during his stay in administrative segregation will be DENIED without prejudice at this time. Response to Court due by 9/10/2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/11/15. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?