Moon v. Jordan et al

Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Defendant: John Jordan, James Mulcahy, T. C. Stevens, Ruth Ann Dickerson, Bud Proffer, Tina Henderson, Tree Waller, Unknown Davis and Unknown Murphy
Case Number: 1:2015cv00167
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Cape Girardeau
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. [ECF No. 93] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall pay to this Court the fu ll $505 filing and docketing fees for filing an appeal. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for the appeal of the instant action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any future document or pleadings in connection with his appeal directly with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/11/2018. (JMC)
November 13, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 47) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Exemption from the Certificate of Service (Service) Requirement (ECF No. 62), Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 67), and Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 69) areDENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/13/17. (MRS)
November 9, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (ECF No. 43), Plaintiffs Second Motion to Reset/ Amend Scheduling Order (ECF No. 44), and Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Proceeding (Pending Resolution of Discovery and Pending Motions) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) (ECF No. 56) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/9/2017. (JMC)
November 8, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Darnell Wesly Moon. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Third Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 45) is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/8/17. (MRS)
February 28, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 40) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. The Court will not appoint counsel for Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send ten blank "Subpoena in a Civil Case" forms to plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits any subpoenas duces tecum to this Court, he must also submit a memorandum which explains as to each subpoena (1) why the documents he seeks are relevant to his case, (2) why he believes the entity or individual subpoenaed has possession of relevant documents, and (3) how he will provide the necessary costs, if any, related to document production. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/28/17. (MRS)
January 9, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reset Deadlines (ECF No. 31) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) (ECF No. 33) is GR ANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 28) is DENIED as moot because it was directed at the previous Complaint. Defendants can re-file the Motion for Summary Judgment in accordance with the new deadlines. ( Discovery Completion due by 5/1/2017., Motion to Join Parties due by 2/17/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2017.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/9/2017. (JMC)
March 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 23] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to stay proceedings [ECF No. 24]is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/7/16. (MRS)
December 7, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Unknown Davis isDISMISSED from this action without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/7/2015. (JMC)
October 29, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must provide the Court with the information necessary to serve defendants Tree Waller, Unknown Murphy, Unknown Davis, and Bud Proffer with process. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss these defendants without further proceedings. Response to Court due by 11/30/2015. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/29/15. (CSG)
September 28, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant John Does 1-15 are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on the named defendants in their individual capacities. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/28/2015. (JMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Wesly Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. C. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Ann Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Proffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?