Like v. Wallace
Plaintiff: |
Travis Like |
Defendant: |
Ian Wallace |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00172 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2017 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Donna Wigfall, Defendant Ian Wallace motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/11/17. (MRS)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Travis Like motion is GRANTED( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 1/22/2016.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed t o serve process on defendants Ian Wallace and Donna Wigfall in their individual capacities. Defendants are employees of the Missouri Department of Corrections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against Dwayne Kempker, his official-capacity claims, his prison policy claim, and his claim regarding the deprivation of property are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/22/15. (MRS)
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED plaintiff's request for a court order to require SECC to allow him to order additional supplies to assist him in the filing of his § 1983 civil rights complaint [Doc. #3] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cas es. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proce ed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six month peri od immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order in a timely matter, this action will be dismissed, without prejudice. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/3/2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/3/2015. (JMC)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM OPINION..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filin g fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in formapauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account s tatement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Response to Court due by 11/2/2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/15. (MRS) W/ FORMS AS ORDERED modified on 10/2/2015 (MRS).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?