Mitchell v. Akins
Plaintiff: Demario Markel Mitchell
Defendant: Torrance Akins
Case Number: 1:2015cv00189
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Pemiscot
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/11/2016. (JMC)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/19/2016.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/28/15. (MRS)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within twenty-one days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/4/2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/15. (CSG)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $16.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint no later than twenty-eight (28) days from the date o f this Order. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. Dated this ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/23/2015., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 11/25/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/26/2015. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demario Markel Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrance Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?