Williamson v. Corizon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Lamont Williamson |
Defendant: |
Corizon, Inc., Mina Massey and Regina Beggs |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00220 |
Filed: |
November 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 12, 2016 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.. IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order in which to submit his initial partial filing fee of $1.70.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall not iss ue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and is malicious. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's case and all of his cause s of action against all defendants are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 11/14/2016.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/12/16. (MRS)
|
June 16, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Lamont Williamson, 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Lamont Williamson, 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in f orma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lamont Williamson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.70 w ithin thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case numb er; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs second motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 9] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail plaintiff a copy of the Court's form "Motion to Proceed in F orma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases" and a form prisoner complaint for filing a civil rights action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. 3] is DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plainti ff fails to comply with thisOrder, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without furthernotice. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/18/2016, Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 7/18/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 6/16/16. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?