Beckermann v. Babich et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffrey A. Beckermann |
Defendant: |
Glen Babich, John Eppolito, Jason Clements, Cody Stanley, Lisa Tabor, Julie Fipps, J. Cofield, William Strange, Brad Clark, Myrtle Pruitt, Brandy Hickey and Unknown Dowster |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00105 |
Filed: |
May 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 2, 2018 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jason Clements, Defendant John Eppolito, Defendant Julie Fipps, Defendant Jewel Cofield, Defendant Glen Babich, Defendant Lisa Taber, 79 MOTION for Sum mary Judgment filed by Defendant William Strange, Defendant Brad Clark, Defendant Brandy Hickey, Defendant Myrtle Pruitt. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Corizon Defendants' motion for summary judgment (#74) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Correctional Center Defendants' motion for summary judgment (#79) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/2/18. (CSG)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 41) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/21/17. (CSG)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann; motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/29/16. (CSG)
|
October 12, 2016 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/12/16. (CSG)
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann, 4 MOTION for Leave to Enter Exhibits B-S filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann, 6 MOTION for L eave to Enter New Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann, 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 DCM Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Beckermann. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauper is [Doc. 2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $9.10 within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United State s District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to file an amended c omplaint [Doc. 5] is GRANTED in that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, in accordance with the specific instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to f ile exhibits at this time [Docs. 4 and 6] are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to him. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint at this time.(Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/8/2016, Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 7/8/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/8/16. (CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?