Jefferson v. Hudgens et al
Plaintiff: |
Willie Jefferson |
Defendant: |
J Hudgens, M. Boldin and R. Beggs |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00219 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Cape Girardeau |
Presiding Judge: |
Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 24, 2019 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 80 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Willie Jefferson; motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis o n appeal (Docket No. 80) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $68.88 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for the appeal of the instant action. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/23/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/24/19. (CSG)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, either pay the full $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that if plaintiff files a motion for leave to proceed informa pauperis, he must provide a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the notice of appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis -Prisoner Cases form Response to Court due by 5/29/2019.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/29/19. (MRS)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 55), is GRANTED. A separate judgment will accompany this order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/28/2019. (JMC)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 17] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 4/3/2017. (JMC)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defense counsel must notify the Court, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, whether defendant M. Boldin is a former employee of the Department of Corrections.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Boldin is a former employee, then counsel must notify the Court, in camera, of his last known residential address. Response to Court due by 2/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 2/1/2017. (JMC)
|
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 14 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Court Order filed by Plaintiff Willie Jefferson ( Response to Court due by 12/21/2016.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time [ECF No. 14] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's response is due no later than December 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/22/2016. (JMC)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must inform the Court, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, of defendant's actual name. Response to Court due by 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/7/2016. (JMC)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $63 within thirty (30) days of the date of th is Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and ( 4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants J. Hudgens and M. Bolden, both of whom are alleged to be correctional officers at the SoutheastCorrectional Center. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED defendant s R. Lincoln, C. Cosey, R. Beggs, and I. Wallace are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be issued separately. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/11/2016.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/9/2016. (JMC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?