Halsey et al v. The Townsend Corporation of Indiana et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Halsey and Tammy Kennedy
Defendant: The Townsend Corporation of Indiana and Jeff Alan
Case Number: 1:2017cv00004
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply (#57) is GRANTED IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment (#50) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' claim against Townsend Tree is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendant Townsend Corporation is granted summary judgment on plaintiffs' claim against it. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/21/2018. (JMC)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Townsend Tree Service Company's motion for summary judgment (#29) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/22/17. (CSG)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 36 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Identify Expert Witnesses and Provide Reports filed by Plaintiff Tammy Kennedy, Plaintiff Andrew Halsey. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to extend time to identify expert witnesses and provide reports (#36) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial date is reset for September 10, 2018. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed amended case management order by October 18, 2017. (Joint Proposed Amended Case Management Order due by 10/18/2017, Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 09:00 AM in Southeast Div - Courtroom 4B before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr., Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2018, Pretrial Compliance due by 8/21/2018.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/4/17. (CSG)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Tammy Kennedy, Plaintiff Andrew Halsey. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to remand (#7) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/18/17. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halsey et al v. The Townsend Corporation of Indiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Townsend Corporation of Indiana
Represented By: George Partrick Coughlin
Represented By: Matthew William Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Alan
Represented By: Justin S. Chapell
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Silker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Halsey
Represented By: Kirk Rowan Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Kennedy
Represented By: C. H. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?