Wright v. Drury et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wright
Defendant: Wes Drury, Justin Wouten, Ryan Dennis, Unknown Pratt, Unknown Scoggins and Ryan Unknown
Case Number: 1:2017cv00120
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/28/2018. (JMC)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs official capacity claims against Ryan are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of plaintiffs claims against Wouten are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that the Clerk of Court shall issue process, or causeprocess to issue, upon defendant Ryan in his individual capacity at 131 S. New Madrid Street, Benton, Missouri 63736. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/4/17. (MRS)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Wright motion is GRANTEDIT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $9.25 within thirt y (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint inaccordance with the instructions set forth herein within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff two blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms, and one prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed(Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/10/2017., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/19/2017.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/19/17. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Drury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Wouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?