Jackson v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jackson
Defendant: Nicole Green, Ashley Green, Unknown Pewitt, Jimmy Smith and Bob Holder
Case Number: 1:2017cv00143
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION MEMORANDUM..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 29], is GRANTED. This matter is dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery, [Doc. No. 31], is denied as moot.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/13/18. (MRS)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION MEMORANDUM re: 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Anthony Jackson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. No. 26] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/22/18. (CSG)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, defense counsel J. Thaddeus Eckendrode, jte@eckenrode-law.com, shall submit the last known home addresses for defendant Dr. Charles Pewitt to the Court, under seal and ex parte, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Response to Court due by 2/7/2018. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/17/18. (CSG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Anthony Jackson motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not assess an initial filing fee at this time.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that th e Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Bob Holder, Nicole Green, Jimmy Smith, Ashley Green and Unknown Dr. Pewitt in their official and individual capacities. Defendants shall be served by issuance o f summons and service by the U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants Bob Holder, Nicole Green, Jimmy Smith, Ashley Green and Unknown Dr. Pewitt shall reply to plaintiff's claim s within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/12/17. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?