Sutton v. Dunklin County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Sutton
Defendant: Dunklin County Jail, Unknown Allen and Larissa Unknown
Case Number: 1:2018cv00063
Filed: March 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Dunklin
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 194 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 195 PRO SE MOTION filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton's Motion to Appoint Coun sel [ECF No. 194] and Pro Se Motion to Compel Track 5 [ECF No. 195] are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Sutton's last known address a copy of an updated docket sheet; the Court's June 21, 2022, Memorandum and Order and Judgment [ECF Nos. 184, 185]; and this order. Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 06/03/2024. (CMH)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Marishia Sandefur's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Sandefurs Requests for Admission (Doc. 159) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat Defendants Bob Holder, Allen Edwards, and Pam Buchanan's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 163) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant Marishia Sandefur's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 170) is GRANTED. A separate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/21/2022. (JMC)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counsel's Motion for Leave to Withdraw (Doc. 152) is GRANTED, and Counsel shall notify Plaintiff of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Doc 149) and Motion to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Disposition of Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 157) are DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the deadlines for completing discovery and filing dispositive motions are each EXTENDED BY FIFTEEN (15) DAYS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/14/2022. (JMC)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 112 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 113 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 111 MOTION for Ruling on filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 110 PRO SE MOTION memorandum and Order filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton's motions to compel justice, for status updates, for forms, and for other similar relief 110 111 112 113 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/3/20. (CSG)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Bob Holder, Defendant Allen Edwards, Defendant Pam Buchanan, 103 MOTION for Sum mary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 94 PRO SE MOTION Memorandum and Order filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Marishia Wheele. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that def endants' motions for summary judgment 78 97 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for summary judgment and for entry of orders 75 94 103 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be set for trial after the current national emergency because of the COVID 19 pandemic has ended. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/6/20. (CSG)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 67 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel discovery 67 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than July 22, 2019, defendants shall produce to plaintiff camera footage from the specific areas of Dunklin County Jail as set out in plaintiff's motion, for the dates and times set out in the motion. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/12/19. (CSG)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 61 is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a ruling on his motion for summary judgment 66 is denied as moot.. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/8/19. (MRS)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 57 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 53 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 56 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Case Management Disclosure filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 54 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Compel Camera Footage 53 is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated in my Januar y 4, 2019, order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 54 is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated in my January 7, 2019, order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 57 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Disclosures 56 is granted. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/5/19. (CSG)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 50 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 51 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 49 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/17/19. (MRS)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 47 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 46 MOTION to Depose all defendants filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton's Motion to Compel Depositions of All Defendants 46 and Motion to Compel Discovery 47 are denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/4/19. (CSG)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall change the Court's docket to reflect the proper names of defendants Marishia Wheeler and Allen Edwards. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause p rocess to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Marishia Wheeler and Allen Edwards at the Dunklin County Sheriff's Department, 1175 Floyd Street, Kennett, MO 63857, in their individual capacities as to plaintiff's claims of excessive for ce. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis in this action, service shall be effectuated by the United States Marshal's Office through summons, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/1/18. (CSG)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that A.M. Spradling, III, shall submit, under seal and ex parte, the last known residential address for Ms. Wilson, under seal and ex parte, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Response to Court due by 11/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/15/18. (CSG)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 17 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee. filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton, 18 MOTION for Extension of: Ti me to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lamont Sutton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 16) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for an extension of time in which to pay the initial partial filing fee (Docket No. 17; Docket No. 18) are DENIED AS MOOT as plaintiff has made the payment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendants Allen Oliver and Marissa Wilson in their individual capacities as to plaintiff's claims of excessive force. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendants Bob Holder and Pa m Buchanan in their individual capacities as to plaintiffs claims of deliberate indifference to his medical needs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendant Pam Buchanan in her individu al capacity as to plaintiff's claim of failure to intervene. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Allen Oliver, Marissa Wilson, Bob Holder, and Pam Buchanan in their officials capacities are DISMISSED without pre judice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining federal claims against defendants Allen Oliver, Marissa Wilson, Bob Holder, and Pam Buchanan in their individual capacities are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plai ntiff's claims against defendant Dunklin County Jail are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not betaken in good faith. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/10/18. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Dunklin County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunklin County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?