Hill v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Dina Hill
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00157
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Cape Girardeau
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by the U.S Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/9/2018, by serving the U.S. Attorney General. (JMC)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed the U.S. Marshals Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/9/2018, by serving the Social Security Administration. (JMC)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by the U.S Marshals Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/6/2018, by serving the U.S. Attorney, answer due 9/4/2018. (JMC)
July 11, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
June 27, 2018 Summonses Issued as to defendants Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to USM. (JMC)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4 Social Security Appeal. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02, plaintiff must, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, serveand file a brief within thirty (30) days after the Commissioner's service of an answer and the administrative transcript. The Commissioner must serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the service of the plaintiffs brief. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of theCommissioner's brief to file a reply brief. No further briefs shall be filed except by leave of court upon a showing of good cause. A brief filed pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02 shall not exceed fifteen (15) standard typed pages, exclusive of a signature page and attachments, without leave of court. A reply brief shall not exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/27/2018. (JMC)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueon the complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/27/2018. (JMC)
June 26, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (JMC)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dina Hill. (Overton, Kathleen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Dina Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons US Atty, #5 Summons Office of Regional Counsel)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Hill
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?