Moore v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Crystal Mae Moore
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00194
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Crystal Mae Moore. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/16/2018 by serving the U.S. Attorney General. (Payne, J.) Modified on 8/22/2018 (JMC).
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Crystal Mae Moore. Defendant Nancy Berryhill served on 8/13/2018 by serving the U.S. Attorney. (Payne, J.) Modified on 8/22/2018 (JMC).
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Crystal Mae Moore. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Payne, J.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Crystal Mae Moore. (CSG)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 7, 2018 Summonses Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. (CSG)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMONSES by Plaintiff Crystal Mae Moore. (Payne, J.)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/23/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/2/18. (CSG)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-6677893, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Crystal Mae Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B - Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payne, J.)
August 2, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Plaintiff's attorney instructed to file prepared summonses as a supplemental to the complaint. (CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Mae Moore
Represented By: J. Michael Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?