Perkins v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Dana Lachelle Perkins
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
In Re: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00221
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Dana Lachelle Perkins. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff's Complaint for Judicial Review of Decision of the Commission of Social Security is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/18/18. (MRS)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Thu Oct 18 15:13:58 CDT 2018 (Schaefer, Michelle)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Dana Lachelle Perkins (MRS)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/24/2018 through US Atty, answer due 11/23/2018. (MRS) Modified on 10/12/2018 (CSG).
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/24/2018 through SSA, answer due 11/23/2018. (MRS)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/26/2018 through US Attorney General. (MRS)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshal's Office - Cape. (MRS)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative..Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty ( 60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/10/18. (see Order)(MRS)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueon the complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/10/18. (MRS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dana Lachelle Perkins. (MRS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Dana Lachelle Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(MRS)
September 10, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (MRS)
September 10, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 10 12:00:38 CDT 2018 (admin,)
September 10, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Lachelle Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?