Wilcox v. Trinity Marine Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stanley Wilcox
Defendant: Trinity Marine Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00254
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #8 Amended Complaint Waiver of the Service of Summons by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Trinity Marine Products, Inc. 10/24/2018 Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued 10/24/18, Jury demand, , filed by Stanley Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dobson, Jerome)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda Davis Anthony for Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Anthony, Amanda)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Waiver of the Service of Summons by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Stanley Wilcox. (Dobson, Jerome) Modified on 10/25/2018 (CSG).
October 22, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL).. The above styled and numbered case was opened on October 19, 2018 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., United States District Judge, under cause number 1:18-cv-00254 SNLJ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:18-cv-01784-UNA be administratively closed. (MFG)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Trinity Marine Products, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6825914, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Stanley Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit MCHR Notice of Right to Sue)(Dobson, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Trinity Marine Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Wilcox
Represented By: Jerome J. Dobson
Represented By: Amanda Davis Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Marine Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?