Pickens v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Patrick Pickens
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00001
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2, Standard. Motion to Join Parties due by 10/1/2019. Discovery Completion due by 1/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Southeast Division - Cape Girardeau before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 01:30 PM in Southeast Division - Cape Girardeau before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/30/2020. Motion in Limine due by 7/10/2020.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/22/19. (MRS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Joint Rule 502(d) Order by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Dick, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Patrick Pickens. . (Wolff, Nelson)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Celia K. Douglas for Plaintiff Patrick Pickens. (Douglas, Celia)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2, Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/26/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/5/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers at St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/29/19. (MRS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas J. Lamb for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Lamb, Nicholas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by David A. Dick for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Dick, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Dick, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Patrick Pickens. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Wolff, Nelson)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (MRS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Nelson Wolff. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MRS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Patrick Pickens Process Server: McDowell and Assoc (MRS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company with receipt number 0865-6960695, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Patrick Pickens. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Form Notice of Intent to Use Special Process Server, #4 Summons)(Wolff, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickens v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Nicholas J. Lamb
Represented By: David A. Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pickens
Represented By: Nelson G. Wolff
Represented By: Celia K. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?