Anderson v. Jennings
Petitioner: Terrance Lee Anderson and Terrance Lutrek Anderson
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Logan for Respondent Richard Jennings. (Logan, Patrick)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CAPITAL HABEAS SCHEDULNG ORDER: Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/5/2019. See order for full details. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/5/2019. (JMC)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #1] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender's Office for the Western District of Missouri Capital Habeas Unit is APPOINTED to represent petitioner in this action, and as such, counsel's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #2 and #3] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after such time as secondary counsel, the EasternDistrict of Pennsylvania CHU, are approved to appear in this action pursuant to the out-of district protocol, the Pennsylvania CHU shall move separately for appointment of counsel on behalf of petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that simultaneously with this Memorandum and Order, the Court shall issue a Case Management Order in this Capital Habeas Action. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/5/2019. (JMC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Supplement #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Terrance Lutrek Anderson. (Kirsch, Daniel)
January 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (CSG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Terrance Lee Anderson. (Kirsch, Daniel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Terrance Lee Anderson. (Kirsch, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Lee Anderson
Represented By: Daniel E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Lutrek Anderson
Represented By: Daniel E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Represented By: Caroline M. Coulter
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?