Dunlap v. IOC-Caruthersville, LLC
Plaintiff: Pamela G. Dunlap
Defendant: IOC-Caruthersville, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/9/19. (CSG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Colvin, Amanda)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC. . (Colvin, Amanda)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/8/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/15/2019 10:30 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/1/19. (CSG)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap (Consents to Join) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles B. Jellinek for Defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC. (Jellinek, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (CSG)
May 1, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap, Defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CSG)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by IOC-Caruthersville, LLC.(Colvin, Amanda)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
April 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
April 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pamela G. Dunlap. IOC-Caruthersville, LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (McClelland, Ryan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
April 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CSG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Pamela G. Dunlap Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations. (CSG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant IOC-Caruthersville, LLC with receipt number 0865-7137519, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Pamela G. Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Pamela G. Dunlap, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #5 Summons IOC-Caruthersville, LLC d/b/a Lady Luck Casino Caruthersville)(McClelland, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. IOC-Caruthersville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IOC-Caruthersville, LLC
Represented By: Amanda E. Colvin
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela G. Dunlap
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?