Smith et al v. IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC

Plaintiff: Maria L. Smith and Casandra J. Henderson
Defendant: IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Conference reset for 7/24/2019 11:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/2/19. (MRS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/15/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/22/2019 10:30 AM in Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/25/19. (MRS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Travis A. Niswonger for Defendant IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC. (Niswonger, Travis)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles B. Jellinek for Defendant IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC. (Jellinek, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC.(Colvin, Amanda)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiffs Casandra J. Henderson, Maria L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC. (Colvin, Amanda) filed by IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/4/19. (MRS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC. (Colvin, Amanda)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiffs Casandra J. Henderson, Maria L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiffs Casandra J. Henderson, Maria L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Maria L. Smith, Casandra J. Henderson. IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (McClelland, Ryan)
May 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CSG)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Casandra J. Henderson, Maria L. Smith Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations. (CSG)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class and Collective Action Complaint) against defendant IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC with receipt number 0865-7190694, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Maria L. Smith, Casandra J. Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Maria L. Smith, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Join - Casandra J. Henderson, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #6 Summons)(McClelland, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria L. Smith
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casandra J. Henderson
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IOC-Cape Girardeau LLC
Represented By: Travis A. Niswonger
Represented By: Amanda E. Colvin
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?