Extra Hands, Inc. et al v. Department of Mental Health et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Smith, Extra Hands and Extra Hands, Inc.
Defendant: Department of Mental Health, Angie Alford and Missouri Department of Mental Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith. (Bent, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Bent, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Out of Time #12 . For the reasons stated in the Motion, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' response to the Motion to Dismiss is due by October 4, 2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on October 1, 2019. (ACL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Out of time to File Response To Motion To Dismiss by Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith. (Bent, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Angie Alford, Missouri Department of Mental Health, Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (CMH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Denise Garrison McElvein for Defendants Angie Alford, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (McElvein, Denise)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Angie Alford, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Underhill, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Angie Alford, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Underhill, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James A. Underhill for Defendants Angie Alford, Missouri Department of Mental Health. (Underhill, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Extra Hands, Inc.. Missouri Department of Mental Health served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Bent, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Extra Hands, Inc.. Angie Alford served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Bent, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to cbb@cbentlaw.com. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CMH) Modified on 8/15/2019 (CMH).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER on Missouri Department of Mental Health by Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith Process Server: Tim Moore (CMH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER on Angie Alford by Plaintiffs Extra Hands, Inc., Kathy Smith Process Server: Tim Moore (CMH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Angie Alford, Department of Mental Health with receipt number AMOEDC-7395493, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Kathy Smith, Extra Hands. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing For, #3 Summons Summons Dept. of Mental Health, #4 Summons Summons Angie Alford, #5 Summons Notice of Intent To Use Process Server, #6 Summons Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Bent, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Extra Hands, Inc. et al v. Department of Mental Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Smith
Represented By: Christopher B. Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Extra Hands
Represented By: Christopher B. Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Extra Hands, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Alford
Represented By: James A. Underhill
Represented By: Denise Garrison McElvein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Mental Health
Represented By: James A. Underhill
Represented By: Denise Garrison McElvein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?