Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B. v. Focus Bank
Plaintiff: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Defendant: Focus Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00151
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Focus Bank's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Focus Bank.(Mangian, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (MRS)
October 4, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (MRS)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #9 . For the reasons stated in the Motion, IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant's Answer is due by October 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on September 30, 2019. (ACL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Focus Bank. (Mangian, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Mangian for Defendant Focus Bank. (Mangian, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.. Focus Bank served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Trelz, Eric)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Abigail Leigh Twenter for Plaintiff Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (Twenter, Abigail)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Eric M. Trelz. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MFG)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL).. The above styled and numbered case was opened on September 3, 2019 and assigned tothe Eastern Division.After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The caseshould have been assigned to the Southeastern Division.Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the SoutheasternDivision and assigned to the Honorable Abbie Crites-Leoni, United States Magisrate Judge, undercause number 1:19-cv-00151-ACL.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:19-cv-02471-UNA beadministratively closed. (MFG)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Provident Savings Bank Process Server: Ferrell Court Services (Trelz, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Provident Savings Bank. Parent companies: Provident Financial Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Trelz, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Focus Bank with receipt number AMOEDC-7436468, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Provident Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Check, #2 Exhibit B - Stamped Check, #3 Exhibit C - Check Adjustment Request, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Alteration, #5 Exhibit E - Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Response Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Summons)(Trelz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B. v. Focus Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: Eric M. Trelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?