Burris v. Monsanto Company; et al
Plaintiff: Allen Burris
Defendant: BASF SE, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CSG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00205. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) (MDL No. 2820) transferring case to Eastern District of Missouri. (case terminated) (adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Monsanto Company - Served on 8/8/2019. by Allen Burris (Waller, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BASF Corporation - Served on 8/16/2019; BASF SE - Served on 8/16/2019. by Allen Burris (Waller, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BASF Corporation (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BASF SE (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Monsanto Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/2/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1278411 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Allen Burris (Waller, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/8/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company; by Allen Burris (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Allen Burris (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. Monsanto Company; et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Burris
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Mark A. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?