Gerdan Slipforming v. Local Union 513 Pension Fund
Plaintiff: Gerdan Slipforming
Defendant: Local Union 513 Pension Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Local Union 513 Pension Fund. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiff Gerdan Slipforming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intent to Terminate letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Withdrawal Liability letter)(Grimm, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Local Union 513 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memoradum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue)(Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie L. Reyes-Jones for Defendant Local Union 513 Pension Fund. (Reyes-Jones, Jamie)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Local Union 513 Pension Fund. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. (CSG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gerdan Slipforming Process Server: AAi Legal Services (Grimm, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #1 Summons) (CSG).
October 7, 2019 ***REMARK - Court is advised by plaintiff's attorney that Waiver of Service will be issued on behalf of defendant. (CSG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to contact Clerk's Office re:service on defendant. (CSG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Gerdan Slipforming. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Grimm, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Local Union 513 Pension Fund with receipt number AMOEDC-7501107, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gerdan Slipforming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Grimm, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerdan Slipforming v. Local Union 513 Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerdan Slipforming
Represented By: John W. Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union 513 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jamie L. Reyes-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?