Miller v. Saul
Plaintiff: Theresa Miller
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00195
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal's Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Social Security Administration on 12/4/19. (CSG)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal service showing service on defendant by certified mail to U.S. Attorney General on 12/4/19. (CSG)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/4/2019 by U.S. Attorney's Office; answer due 2/3/2020. (CSG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Theresa Miller, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CSG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 4, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to U.S. Marshal Service, Cape Girardeau, Missouri. (CSG)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/25/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/4/19. (CSG)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/4/19. (CSG)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (CSG)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Theresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Theresa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Miller
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?